Lewis et al v. Prima Builders Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharon Lewis and Nathaniel Lewis
Defendant: Prima Builders Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02282
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; dismissing this case for lack of jurisdiction; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/12/2019. (cm 8/13/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathaniel Lewis, Sharon Lewis(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prima Builders Inc., filed by Nathaniel Lewis, Sharon Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet Corrected) (ybs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Prima Builders Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prima Builders Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?