American Federation of Government Employees et al v. Office of Special Counsel
Plaintiff: American Federation of Government Employees and American Federation of Government Employees Local 2578
Defendant: Office of Special Counsel
Case Number: 8:2019cv02322
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Federation of Government Employees, American Federation of Government Employees Local 2578. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Delivery receipts)(Jones, Robert Stanton)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Affidavit of Service, filed by American Federation of Government Employees Local 2578 and American Federation of Government Employees was filed using the incorrect docketing event. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process - Summons Returned Executed as to USA. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Office of Special Counsel, U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland, U.S. Attorney General on August 27, 2019, filed by American Federation of Government Employees, American Federation of Government Employees Local 2578. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery Receipts)(Jones, Robert Stanton) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel F Jacobson. Directing attorney Daniel F Jacobson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/30/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel F. Jacobson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8207152.) by American Federation of Government Employees, American Federation of Government Employees Local 2578(Jones, Robert Stanton)
August 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 8/13/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. American Federation of Government Employees, American Federation of Government Employees Local 2578 or counsel for American Federation of Government Employees, American Federation of Government Employees Local 2578 are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/27/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to Office of Special Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8175317.), filed by American Federation of Government Employees, American Federation of Government Employees Local 2578. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Jones, Robert Stanton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Federation of Government Employees et al v. Office of Special Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Federation of Government Employees
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Federation of Government Employees Local 2578
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Represented By: Daniel F Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Special Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?