Kaur v. Lai et al
Appellee: Yan Yun Lai and Shao Lin Lai
Appellant: Jaswinder Kaur
Trustee: Nancy Spencer Grigsby
Case Number: 8:2019cv02347
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental Transmittal re #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Order Dismissing Case)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that within Ten (10) days from the date of this Order Appellant must submit the designation and statement to the Court and must also submit a statement explaining his prolonged delay in filing those documents. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/4/2019. (c/m 9/6/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Notification Letter (c/m ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 19-20472,, filed by Jaswinder Kaur. (Attachments: #1 Order being appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaur v. Lai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Yan Yun Lai
Represented By: Steven Lewis Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shao Lin Lai
Represented By: Steven Lewis Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jaswinder Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Nancy Spencer Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?