United States of America v. Vinci
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Pietro Vinci
Case Number: 8:2019cv02441
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 31:5321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel J Bell. Directing attorney Daniel J Bell to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/23/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Laura Gavioli. Directing attorney Laura Gavioli to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/23/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Pietro Vinci's answer is due 11/1/2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/20/2019. (lmys, Chambers)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Pietro Vinci(Going, Kristin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel J. Bell (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8243856.) by Pietro Vinci(Going, Kristin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura L. Gavioli (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8243742.) by Pietro Vinci(Going, Kristin)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/10/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Pietro Vinci served on 9/1/2019, answer due 9/23/2019.(McMonagle, Ryan)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 8/23/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. United States of America or counsel for United States of America are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/6/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Pietro Vinci.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pietro Vinci, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McMonagle, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Vinci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pietro Vinci
Represented By: Laura L Gavioli
Represented By: Daniel J Bell
Represented By: Kristin K Going
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ryan McMonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?