Mojica v. US Office of Personnel Management
Plaintiff: Maria Rory A. Mojica
Defendant: US Office of Personnel Management
Case Number: 8:2019cv02556
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Charles B Day
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 5 U.S.C. ยง 7101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting Plaintiff 28 days from the date of this Order to pay full filing fee of $400.00; Supplement the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 9/25/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 9/11/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/11/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Maria Rory A. Mojica or counsel for Maria Rory A. Mojica are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/25/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/11/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maria Rory A. Mojica(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US Office of Personnel Management, filed by Maria Rory A. Mojica. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mojica v. US Office of Personnel Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Office of Personnel Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rory A. Mojica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?