GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company v. Wolf Fire Protection, Inc.
Plaintiff: GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Wolf Fire Protection, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02574
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 Status Report. The scheduling order is modified as requested. A status report is due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/31/2019. (bc, Chambers)
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Scheduling Order and Discovery by Wolf Fire Protection, Inc.(Dygert, Timothy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 (FILED IN ERROR - PER COUNSEL) STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Scheduling Order and Discovery by Wolf Fire Protection, Inc.(Ferguson, Robert) Modified on 10/31/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/18/2019. (jmm, Chambers)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER ORDER regarding assignment for all proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/18/2019. (jmm, Chambers)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 10/15/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 Supplemental to #15 Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Wolf Fire Protection, Inc. (Dygert, Timothy)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wolf Fire Protection, Inc.. (Dygert, Timothy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Dygert, Jr on behalf of Wolf Fire Protection, Inc. (Dygert, Timothy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wolf Fire Protection, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wolf Fire Protection, Inc. for Wolf Fire Protection, Inc..(Ferguson, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Jury Demand by Wolf Fire Protection, Inc..(Ferguson, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan Acklen. Directing attorney Jonathan Acklen to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel Hogan. Directing attorney Daniel Hogan to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan B. Acklen (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8219547.) by GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company(Stravitz, Eric)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Hogan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8219537.) by GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company(Stravitz, Eric)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GuideOne America Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GuideOne Elite Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GuideOne National Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GuideOne Property & Casualty Insurance Company for GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company.(Stravitz, Eric)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/6/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company or counsel for GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/20/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/13/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Wolf Fire Protection, Inc..(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wolf Fire Protection, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8217161.), filed by GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stravitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company v. Wolf Fire Protection, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolf Fire Protection, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Ferguson, Jr
Represented By: Timothy J. Dygert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric N Stravitz
Represented By: Daniel Hogan
Represented By: Jonathan B Acklen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?