Sterling Mirror Company, LLC v. Xiaogang et al
Plaintiff: Sterling Mirror Company, LLC
Defendant: Cui Zhivang, Hao Xiaogang, Jingato Yuan, Luoyang Gangxin Glass Technology CO., LTD., Yuan, Cui, Steven Xiaogang and Steven Hao
Case Number: 8:2019cv02638
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Luoyang Gangxin Glass Technology CO., LTD. (Mu, Shengmao)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Sterling Mirror Company, LLC by Luoyang Gangxin Glass Technology CO., LTD., Hao Xiaogang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Mu, Shengmao)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as follows: Defendants will have until November 8th, 2019 to move, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/17/2019. (pk3s, Chambers)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond by Luoyang Gangxin Glass Technology CO., LTD., Hao Xiaogang, Jingato Yuan, Cui Zhivang(Mu, Shengmao)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants will have until October 23, 2019 to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/9/2019. (pk3s, Chambers)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shengmao Mu. Directing attorney Shengmao Mu to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Luoyang Gangxin Glass Technology CO., LTD., Hao Xiaogang, Jingato Yuan, Cui Zhivang(Friedman, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L Friedman on behalf of All Defendants (Friedman, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shengmao Mu (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8279070.) by Hao Xiaogang, Jingato Yuan, Cui Zhivang(Friedman, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sterling Mirror Company, LLC. Luoyang Gangxin Glass Technology CO., LTD. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019.(Esworthy, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sterling Mirror Company, LLC. Hao Xiaogang served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019.(Esworthy, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/11/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Luoyang Gangxin Glass Technology CO., LTD., Hao Xiaogang, Jingato Yuan, Cui Zhivang.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sterling Mirror Company, LLC (Esworthy, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8226456.), filed by Sterling Mirror Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Esworthy, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterling Mirror Company, LLC v. Xiaogang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cui Zhivang
Represented By: Shengmao Mu
Represented By: Jeffrey L Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hao Xiaogang
Represented By: Shengmao Mu
Represented By: Jeffrey L Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jingato Yuan
Represented By: Shengmao Mu
Represented By: Jeffrey L Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luoyang Gangxin Glass Technology CO., LTD.
Represented By: Shengmao Mu
Represented By: Jeffrey L Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuan
Represented By: Shengmao Mu
Represented By: Jeffrey L Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cui
Represented By: Shengmao Mu
Represented By: Jeffrey L Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Xiaogang
Represented By: Shengmao Mu
Represented By: Jeffrey L Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hao
Represented By: Shengmao Mu
Represented By: Jeffrey L Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Mirror Company, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Anselm Sodaro Esworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?