Reyes v. Manchester Gardens Condominium et al
Plaintiff: Rosa Maria Reyes and Manchester Gardens Condominium
Defendant: Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered, Linowes and Blocher LLP and EJF Real Estate Services, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02643
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Conditional), #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimSecond Amended Complaint filed by Rosa Maria Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Phillip)
November 6, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Strike #16 Amended Complaint, , #29 MOTION to Strike the Second Amended Complaint Conditional Cross Motion for Leave to Amend Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Rosa Maria Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Phillip)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/22/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2019 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Conditional), #24 MOTION to Strike #16 Amended Complaint, , #29 MOTION to Strike the Second Amended Complaint, #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimSecond Amended Complaint by Rosa Maria Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Skipper, Matthew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike the Second Amended Complaint by Linowes and Blocher LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Haarz, M. Olivia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered.(Ulwick, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 27 Request for Hearing re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Conditional) (Ulwick, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Conditional) by Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Conditional Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Ulwick, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 25 Request for Hearing re #24 MOTION to Strike #16 Amended Complaint, (Ulwick, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Strike #16 Amended Complaint, by Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ulwick, James)
October 14, 2019 Filing 23 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Manchester Gardens Condominium (Bernhardt, Matthew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimSecond Amended Complaint by Manchester Gardens Condominium (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernhardt, Matthew)
October 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Alexander Brown on behalf of Manchester Gardens Condominium (Brown, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Linowes and Blocher LLP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Grounds and Authorities)(Hodges, Daniel)
October 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Rosa Maria Reyes of Service of Process Upon Defendant Manchester Gardens Condominium Before this Case Was Removed (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Process on Defendant Manchester Gardens Condominium While this Action was Pending in State Court)(Robinson, Phillip)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.5.a Certification of Filing of State Court Papers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - State Court Civil-Non-Domestic Case Information Report, labeled as "Request, B/T/ track Assignment" on the State Court Action docket, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - State Court Writ of Summons, labeled as "Summons Issued" on the State Court Action docket, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - State Court Line-Request for Summons to Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered, labeled as "Instructions for Service" on the State Court Action docket, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - State Court Line Request for Summons to Linowes and Blocher LLP, labeled as "Line to Reissue" on the State Court Action Docket, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - State Court Writ of Summons, labeled as "Summons Issued" on the State Court Action docket, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - State Court Affidavit of Service to Lerch Early Brewer Chartered, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - State Court Affidavit of Service to Linowes and Blocher LLP, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - State Court Line Filing Affidavit for EJF Real Estate Services, Inc., #9 Exhibit Ex. I - State Court Entry of Appearance of Alvin I. Frederick, Daniel R. Hodges, and Eccleston and Wolf, P.C. for Defendant Linowes and Blocher, LLP)(Ulwick, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Originally Filed in the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Suggestion of Mootness) filed by Rosa Maria Reyes.(Skipper, Matthew)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rosa Maria Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - L&B NOIL, #2 Affidavit Ex. B - First Reyes Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - LEB NOIL, #4 Affidavit Ex. D - Second Reyes Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Second Amended Class Action Complaint (comparison copy))(Skipper, Matthew)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Response to #3 MOTION to Dismiss is extended up to and including October 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/24/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Originally Filed in the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland by Rosa Maria Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Phillip)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Hearing re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ulwick, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ulwick, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Mills Strickland on behalf of Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered (Strickland, Bradley)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, 5 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, 6 QC Notice - Miscellaneous,, filed by Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered Supplemental Filing of Notice of Removal to properly label exhibits (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Class Action Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - State Court Request for Assignment to Business and Technology Track, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - State Court Submission of Amended Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - State Court Scheduling Order, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - State Court Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - State Court Scheduling Order, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - State Court Notice assigning Case Number, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - State Court Amended Class Action Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - State Court Notice of Plaintiff's Statement of Intent to Assert a Claim for Attorneys' Fees & Costs, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - State Court Request for Writ of Summons to Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - State Court Request for New Summons issued to Linowes and Blocher, LLP, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - State Court Summons to Lerch Early Brewer Chartered, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Ulwick, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Ulwick on behalf of Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered (Ulwick, James)
September 12, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (7-8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against EJF Real Estate Services, Inc., Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered, Linowes and Blocher LLP, Manchester Gardens Condominium, filed by Rosa Maria Reyes.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against EJF Real Estate Services, Inc., Linowes and Blocher LLP, Manchester Gardens Condominium, filed by Rosa Maria Reyes.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered was filed incorrectly. **All state court documents must be properly labeled and filed as separate attachments to the notice of removal (i.e. Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, Exhibit 2 - State Court Summons Issued.. etc). Please re-file the exhibits/attachments using the event Notice(Other). Use one of the exhibits/attachments as the main document and attach the other state court documents as attachments and properly label each attachment.. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered was filed incorrectly. **Not all attorneys listed as counsel have signed the document. Court staff has entered the appearance of only the attorneys who have signed the document. All other attorneys must enter their own entries of appearance. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Linowes and Blocher LLP identifying Other Affiliate ATTORNEYS LIABILITY ASSURANCE SOCIETY for Linowes and Blocher LLP.(Hodges, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Originally Filed in the Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland by Linowes and Blocher LLP (Attachments: #1 Attachment Line - MTD Originally Filed in Circuit Court, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Attachment Entry of Appearance - Circuit Court)(Hodges, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered (Askew, Amy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Montgomery County, case number 468765V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8227480), filed by Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Askew, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Manchester Gardens Condominium et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lerch Early Brewer, Chartered
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Amy Estelle Askew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linowes and Blocher LLP
Represented By: Daniel R Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJF Real Estate Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Maria Reyes
Represented By: Matthew Dwane Skipper
Represented By: Phillip R Robinson
Represented By: Jeffrey A Kahntroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manchester Gardens Condominium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?