Rozario v. Branigan
Appellant: Fulgence Rozario
Appellee: Timothy P. Branigan
Case Number: 8:2019cv02671
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Letter to Counsel Regarding Briefs (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Appellant DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Fulgence Rozario re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Appellant Brief due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 BK #1 CH.13 Voluntary Petition Individual, #2 BK #3 Certificate of Credit Counseling, #3 BK #4 Matrix and Verification of Creditor, #4 BK #6 Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Trustee, #5 BK #7 Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Docs, #6 BK #8 Order Directing Debtors Counsel, #7 BK #9 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, #8 BK #10 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #9 BK #11 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #10 BK #12 BNC Cerificate of Mailing, #11 BK #13 Motion to Extend Time, #12 BK #14 Notice of Returned Mail, #13 BK #15 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #14 BK #16 Notice and Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #15 BK #17 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #16 BK #18 Second Motion to Extend Time, #17 BK #19 Second Notice and Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #18 BK #20 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #19 BK #21 Motion to Extend Time, #20 BK #22 Notice of Returned Mail, #21 BK #23 Notice and Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #22 BK #24 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #23 BK #25 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #24 BK #26 Schedule A/B, #25 BK #27 Schedule C, #26 BK #28 Schedule D, #27 BK #29 Schedule E/F, #28 BK #30 Schedule G, #29 BK #31 Schedule I, #30 BK #32 Schedule J, #31 BK #33 Statement of Financial Affairs, #32 BK #34 Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule, #33 BK #35 Ch. 13 Statement of Monthly Income, #34 BK #36 Summary of Assets and Liabilities, #35 BK #37 Amended Ch. 13 Plan, #36 BK #38 Schedule H, #37 BK #39 Deficiency Notice, #38 BK #40 Notice of Returned Mail, #39 BK #41 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #40 BK #42 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #41 BK #43 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice, #42 BK #44 Deficiency Notice, #43 BK #45 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #44 BK #46 Notice of Returned Mail, #45 BK #47 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #46 BK #48 Certificate of Service, #47 BK #49 Objection to Confirmation of Ch.13 Plan, #48 BK #50 Confirmation Hearing Held, #49 BK #51 Order Denying Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan, #50 BK #54 Notice of Appeal to District Court, #51 BK #62 Appellant Designation of Contents, #52 Docket Sheet, #53 Transmittal Sheet)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 19-17968,, filed by Fulgence Rozario. (Attachments: #1 Order being appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/19/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rozario v. Branigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fulgence Rozario
Represented By: Kosmas Nicholas Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timothy P. Branigan
Represented By: Timothy P Branigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?