CTIS, Inc. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Plaintiff: CTIS, Inc.
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Case Number: 8:2019cv02672
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER re #15 Joint Motion to Stay. Given the parties' representation that they intend to proceed to non-binding mediation, and the parties' request to stay the proceedings until 90 days after the conclusion or termination of such mediation, I am administratively closing this case pending the mediation. The parties are directed to file a status report within 14 days after the close of mediation to inform the Court of the status of this case. If a settlement is not reached at that time, the case will be reopened and the Court will arrange a conference call with the parties to discuss further scheduling. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/5/2019. (pk3s, Chambers)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Stay by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ismail, Kamil)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as follows: the time for National Union to respond to CTIS's Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Monetary Damages is extended to November 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/15/2019. (pk3s, Chambers)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda S Woolf on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania (Woolf, Linda)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania(Ismail, Kamil)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as premature. See this Court's Order of September 16, 2019 (ECF No. 10) establishing pre-motion procedures. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/17/2019. (pk3s, Chambers)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/16/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 7 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. CTIS, Inc. or Counsel for CTIS, Inc. must correct the following error(s): **Your Consent/Decline form is missing a signature. Please re-file your Consent/Decline form using the same event. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/12/2019. (dg3, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. CTIS, Inc. or counsel for CTIS, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/26/2019. (dg3, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.(dg3, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CTIS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff CTIS, Inc., #2 Exhibit A in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit B in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit C in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Niedermayer, Roy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CTIS, Inc. (Niedermayer, Roy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CTIS, Inc. against National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8229515.), filed by CTIS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Niedermayer, Roy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CTIS, Inc. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTIS, Inc.
Represented By: Roy Ira Niedermayer
Represented By: Stephen Hayes Edwards, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Linda S Woolf
Represented By: Kamil Ismail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?