Phillips v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Phillips
Defendant: Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, Commissioner of Social Security and General Counsel
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2019cv02684
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Attorney General, Commissioner of Social Security, General Counsel, U.S. Attorney re #8 Local Rule Writ of Summons - Attorney General as filed in State Court (LeDuc, Vickie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of Remaining State Court Papers(LeDuc, Vickie)
September 16, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/13/2019. (c/m 09/13/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/16/2019 (ol, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2019 The above documents #4 through #6 are copies of filings in the District Court of Maryland for Prince Georges County. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by U.S. Attorney General, Commissioner of Social Security, General Counsel, U.S. Attorney. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 15 days as to Commissioner of Social Security, General Counsel, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Attorney General, Commissioner of Social Security, General Counsel, U.S. Attorney, filed by Bruce E. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E, #6 Attachment F, #7 Attachment G, #8 Attachment H, #9 Attachment)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by Attorney General, Commissioner of Social Security, General Counsel, U.S. Attorney (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LeDuc, Vickie)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Certification Re: State Court Papers(LeDuc, Vickie)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Prince George's County, case number 05200234462019., filed by General Counsel, U.S. Attorney, Commissioner of Social Security, Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Complaint as filed in State Court, #4 Writ of Summons - U.S. Attorney as filed in State Court, #5 Ex. A - Application Summary as filed in State Court, #6 Ex. B - Notice of Award as filed in State Court, #7 Ex. C - SSA Benefits as filed in State Court, #8 Ex. D - Hearing Attachment as filed in State Court, #9 Ex. E - Earnings Records as filed in State Court, #10 Ex. F - Phillips Declaration as filed in State Court, #11 Ex. G - SSA Statement as filed in State Court, #12 Ex. H - Debit Card mailingas filed in State Court, #13 Notice of Appeal Decision as filed in State Court)(LeDuc, Vickie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Counsel
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?