Watson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Watson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2019cv02711
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/14/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Curtis Lee Watson. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2019: #7 Exhibit B - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit C - Unredacted) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Transfer Notification Letter(c/m dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie Leduc and Consent to Magistrate Judge on behalf of Social Security Administration (dg3, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02387. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/30/2019. (zad)
July 31, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/31/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?