Davis et al v. NVR, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edward Gillespie, Frances Davis, Estaban Morales, Josie Welkom, Andrea Gillespie, Reyda Gonzalez-Neives, Darnell Davis, Jason Miranda and Reyda P. Gonzalez-Neives
Defendant: NVR, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02712
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 Correspondence re: Letter Requesting to File NVR Partial Summary Judgment Motion (Koplan, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Consent Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order; Status Report due 03/17/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/22/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER ORDER denying #12 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/22/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by NVR, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Koplan, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 Status Conference held on 10/4/2019 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ats, Chambers)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule Local Rule 103.5(a) NVR's Notice and Certification Regarding All Filings in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Koplan, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand NVR, Inc. Letter Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by NVR, Inc..(Koplan, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER re #12 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Defendant is directed to file a letter response to this motion by October 1, 2019. The letter should be no more than three pages, singled spaced, excluding exhibits. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/27/2019. (pk3s, Chambers)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal NVR, Inc.'s Statement Regarding The Court's Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by NVR, Inc..(Koplan, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Darnell Davis, Frances Davis, Andrea Gillespie, Edward Gillespie, Reyda P. Gonzalez-Neives, Jason Miranda, Estaban Morales (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Discepolo, A)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/20/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call on October 4, 2019 at 4:00pm AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/20/2019. (ats, Chambers)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NVR, Inc. Writ of Summons (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Koplan, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by NVR, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NVR Mortgage Finance, Inc. for NVR, Inc..(Koplan, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/16/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/16/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by NVR, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Each state court document (i.e., complaint, summons, etc.) must be properly labeled and filed as separate attachments. Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to NVR, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/20/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by NVR, Inc., NVR, Inc..(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against NVR, Inc., NVR, Inc., filed by Edward Gillespie, Josie Welkom, Reyda P. Gonzalez-Neives, Estaban Morales, Darnell Davis, Frances Davis, Andrea Gillespie, Jason Miranda.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL19-00819. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8233430), filed by NVR, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Koplan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. NVR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Gillespie
Represented By: A Donald C Discepolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Davis
Represented By: A Donald C Discepolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estaban Morales
Represented By: A Donald C Discepolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josie Welkom
Represented By: A Donald C Discepolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Gillespie
Represented By: A Donald C Discepolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyda Gonzalez-Neives
Represented By: A Donald C Discepolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Davis
Represented By: A Donald C Discepolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Miranda
Represented By: A Donald C Discepolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyda P. Gonzalez-Neives
Represented By: A Donald C Discepolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NVR, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Stuart Koplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?