Russell v. Azar
Plaintiff: Herbert P. Russell
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 8:2019cv02734
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 Transfer Notification Letter (c/m to all counsel dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 4:19-cv-00110. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that the captioned matter is transferred to the United States District Court of Maryland for all future proceedings. The Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint within sixty days of the date of transfer. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 9/16/2019. (BAR)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re: in Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Herbert P Russell re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue Plaintiff's Notice in Response to Defendant's Moton to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue. (Randall, Samuel)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Plaintiff may file a response to Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue on or before August 9, 2019. Ordered by Senior Judge Raner C Collins. (RCC, bm) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Herbert P Russell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randall, Samuel) Modified on 7/15/2019 (BAR).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Alex M Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Attachment A, #4 Attachment B)(Foss, Katherine)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Herbert P Russell: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Notice to Parties-MIDP upon U.S. Attorney for the District of Arizona on 05/02/19. (Randall, Samuel)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, II. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16607249. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-110-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Herbert P Russell. (Randall, Samuel) (MCO)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16607249 filed by Herbert P Russell. (Randall, Samuel) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert P. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?