Tellagemini Communication LLC v. Advanced Communications Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Tellagemini Communication LLC
Defendant: Advanced Communications Solutions LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02786
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 11/6/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tellagemini Communication LLC (Murchison, Chad)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Answer or otherwise Response to #1 Complaint is due on November 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/15/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Supplemental to (Proposed Order) #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Getty, Justus) Modified on 10/15/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Advanced Communications Solutions LLC (Getty, Justus)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justus Lee Getty on behalf of Advanced Communications Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Proposed Order docketed in error by filer)(Getty, Justus) Modified on 10/15/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent/Trademark (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Advanced Communications Solutions LLC.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint, filed by Tellagemini Communication LLC (Murchison, Chad)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tellagemini Communication LLC (Murchison, Chad)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Communications Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8247478.), filed by Tellagemini Communication LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Summons)(Murchison, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tellagemini Communication LLC v. Advanced Communications Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Communications Solutions LLC
Represented By: Justus Lee Getty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tellagemini Communication LLC
Represented By: Chad Ryan Murchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?