Marable et al v. D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dameion Benjamin Russ, Toby Maurice Marable and Dale Maurice Blue
Defendant: Warehouse Employees Union Local 730, D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc. and Gerald Brown
Case Number: 8:2019cv02809
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gerald Brown, D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc..(Baskin, Andrew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Warehouse Employees Union Local 730.(Watts, Matthew)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dale Maurice Blue. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abdullah, Raouf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dale Maurice Blue. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abdullah, Raouf)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file any Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss is extended to and including October 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/15/2019. (td for sat, Chambers)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Dale Maurice Blue, Toby Maurice Marable, Dameion Benjamin Russ (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abdullah, Raouf)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Gerald Brown, D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc., Warehouse Employees Union Local 730 re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal - Joint Removal Statement (Baskin, Andrew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NextWave Distribution Holdings, LLC for D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc..(Baskin, Andrew)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Warehouse Employees Union Local 730 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Watts, Matthew)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Warehouse Employees Union Local 730 (Watts, Matthew)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Gerald Brown, D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Baskin, Andrew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Silvestri on behalf of Gerald Brown, D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc. (Silvestri, Stephen)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Watts on behalf of Warehouse Employees Union Local 730 (Watts, Matthew)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/25/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc., Gerald Brown was filed incorrectly. **Not all attorneys listed as counsel have signed the document. Court staff has entered the appearance of only the attorneys who have signed the document. All other attorneys must enter their own entries of appearance. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Gerald Brown, D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc., Warehouse Employees Union Local 730, filed by Toby Maurice Marable, Dale Maurice Blue, Dameion Benjamin Russ.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL19-27387. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8252332), filed by D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc., Gerald Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit State Court Summons)(Baskin, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marable et al v. D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameion Benjamin Russ
Represented By: Raouf Muhammad Abdullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Maurice Marable
Represented By: Raouf Muhammad Abdullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Maurice Blue
Represented By: Raouf Muhammad Abdullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warehouse Employees Union Local 730
Represented By: Matthew David Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.P.I. Specialty Foods Mid Atlantic, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M Silvestri
Represented By: Andrew Mark Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Brown
Represented By: Stephen M Silvestri
Represented By: Andrew Mark Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?