Ledo Pizza System, Inc. et al v. Datcher et al
Plaintiff: Ledo Pizza System, Inc. and Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd.
Defendant: Sanford Datcher and Ricar Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02819
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #18 Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (until December 16, 2019). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/14/2019. (jmhs, Chambers)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sanford Datcher (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bartley, Shawn)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Dana Bartley on behalf of Sanford Datcher (Bartley, Shawn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ledo Pizza System, Inc., Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd.. Ricar Enterprises, LLC served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019.(Lynch, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ledo Pizza System, Inc., Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd.. Sanford Datcher served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019.(Lynch, John)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER giving the Defendant Thirty (30) days from the date of this Letter Order to retain counsel. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/16/2019. (c/m 10/16/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence from Sanford Datcher regarding the pending case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint, filed by Ledo Pizza System, Inc., Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd. (Lynch, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued 21 days as to Sanford Datcher, Ricar Enterprises, LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/27/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 10/4/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 Telephone Conference (re status of case) held on 9/26/2019 for 30 minutes before Judge Peter J. Messitte.(Court Reporter: Linda Marshall) (jmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd. (Lynch, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ledo Pizza System, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Ledo Pizza Marketing, LLC for Ledo Pizza System, Inc..(Lynch, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd., Ledo Pizza System, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Writ of Summons for Ricar Enterprises, LLC (Lynch, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd., Ledo Pizza System, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Writ of Summons for Sanford Datcher (Lynch, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Ledo Pizza System, Inc., Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/3/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2019 11:00 AM in default hearing location for Greenbelt before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Lynch, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd., Ledo Pizza System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lynch, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injuntive Relief and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8256130.), filed by Ledo Pizza System, Inc., Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Lynch, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledo Pizza System, Inc. et al v. Datcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford Datcher
Represented By: Shawn Dana Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricar Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledo Pizza System, Inc.
Represented By: Garth Edmond Beall
Represented By: John Paul Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledo Pizza Carryots, Ltd.
Represented By: Garth Edmond Beall
Represented By: John Paul Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?