The Electrical Welfare Trust Fund and its Trustees v. Chesapeake Electrical Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: The IBEW Local No. 26 Joint Apprenticeship) and Training Trust Fund and its Trustees: Stephen Kelly; George Hogan; Joe Dabbs; Rich Murphy; Paul Henriqes; Thomas Myers; Joe Daley; Gregg Kaderabek; Kenn, Local Union No. 26, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Collection Agent: George Hogan, The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Pension Trust Fund and its Trustees:Tom Myers; Michael Toman; Rich Murphy; George Hogan; Dave McKay; and Jon Eugenio, The Electrical Welfare Trust Fund and its Trustees: Brian Moorefield; Tom Myers; Joe Dabbs; Greg Warner; Paul Mella; and Francis DiGuiseppe, The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Individual Account Fund: and its Trustees: James Marx; William Briggs; Joseph Richards; Kenneth Basset; Rich Murphy; and Joseph Dabbs, The Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee and its Trustees: James Marx; Rick Steele; Joe Dabbs; Larry Greenhill Sr.; Thang Nguyen; and Tim Miller, The National Electrical Benefit Fund and its Trustees: Kenneth Cooper;David Long; Dennis Quebe; and Lonnie Stephenson, The National Electrical Contractors Association Washington D.C. Chapter, Collection Agent: Jonathan Thomas, The Electrical Welfare Trust Fund and its Trustees, The National Electrical Contractors Association Washington D.C. Chapter, The Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee and its Trustees, The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Individual Account Fund, Local Union No. 26, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, The National Electrical Benefit Fund and its Trustees, The IBEW Local No. 26 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund and its Trustees and The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Pension Trust Fund and its Trustees
Defendant: Chesapeake Electrical Systems, Inc. and Joseph P. Tominovich, Jr., Registered Agent
Case Number: 8:2019cv02937
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Local Union No. 26, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, The Electrical Welfare Trust Fund and its Trustees, The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Individual Account Fund, The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Pension Trust Fund and its Trustees, The IBEW Local No. 26 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund and its Trustees, The Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee and its Trustees, The National Electrical Benefit Fund and its Trustees, The National Electrical Contractors Association Washington D.C. Chapter Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Damages and Relief Sought Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1)(A)(iii) (Leins, Christopher)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/19/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call December 9, 2019 at 3:00pm AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/19/2019. (ats, Chambers)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Chesapeake Electrical Systems, Inc..(Fried, Sima)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sima Gavriella Fried on behalf of Chesapeake Electrical Systems, Inc. (Fried, Sima)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis R Laws on behalf of Chesapeake Electrical Systems, Inc. (Laws, Francis)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Individual Account Fund, The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Pension Trust Fund and its Trustees, The Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee and its Trustees, The National Electrical Benefit Fund and its Trustees, Local Union No. 26, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, The Electrical Welfare Trust Fund and its Trustees, The National Electrical Contractors Association Washington D.C. Chapter, The IBEW Local No. 26 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund and its Trustees. Chesapeake Electrical Systems, Inc. served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019.(Leins, Christopher)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/8/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Chesapeake Electrical Systems, Inc..(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Local Union No. 26, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Collection Agent: George Hogan, The Electrical Welfare Trust Fund and its Trustees: Brian Moorefield; Tom Myers; Joe Dabbs; Greg Warner; Paul Mella; and Francis DiGuiseppe, The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Individual Account Fund: and its Trustees: James Marx; William Briggs; Joseph Richards; Kenneth Basset; Rich Murphy; and Joseph Dabbs, The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Pension Trust Fund and its Trustees:Tom Myers; Michael Toman; Rich Murphy; George Hogan; Dave McKay; and Jon Eugenio, The IBEW Local No. 26 Joint Apprenticeship) and Training Trust Fund and its Trustees: Stephen Kelly; George Hogan; Joe Dabbs; Rich Murphy; Paul Henriqes; Thomas Myers; Joe Daley; Gregg Kaderabek; Kenn, The Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee and its Trustees: James Marx; Rick Steele; Joe Dabbs; Larry Greenhill Sr.; Thang Nguyen; and Tim Miller, The National Electrical Benefit Fund and its Trustees: Kenneth Cooper;David Long; Dennis Quebe; and Lonnie Stephenson, The National Electrical Contractors Association Washington D.C. Chapter, Collection Agent: Jonathan Thomas (Leins, Christopher)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chesapeake Electrical Systems, Inc., Joseph P. Tominovich, Jr., Registered Agent ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8278988.), filed by The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Individual Account Fund: and its Trustees: James Marx; William Briggs; Joseph Richards; Kenneth Basset; Rich Murphy; and Joseph Dabbs, The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Pension Trust Fund and its Trustees:Tom Myers; Michael Toman; Rich Murphy; George Hogan; Dave McKay; and Jon Eugenio, The Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee and its Trustees: James Marx; Rick Steele; Joe Dabbs; Larry Greenhill Sr.; Thang Nguyen; and Tim Miller, The National Electrical Benefit Fund and its Trustees: Kenneth Cooper;David Long; Dennis Quebe; and Lonnie Stephenson, Local Union No. 26, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Collection Agent: George Hogan, The Electrical Welfare Trust Fund and its Trustees: Brian Moorefield; Tom Myers; Joe Dabbs; Greg Warner; Paul Mella; and Francis DiGuiseppe, The National Electrical Contractors Association Washington D.C. Chapter, Collection Agent: Jonathan Thomas, The IBEW Local No. 26 Joint Apprenticeship) and Training Trust Fund and its Trustees: Stephen Kelly; George Hogan; Joe Dabbs; Rich Murphy; Paul Henriqes; Thomas Myers; Joe Daley; Gregg Kaderabek; Kenn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Leins, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Electrical Welfare Trust Fund and its Trustees v. Chesapeake Electrical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IBEW Local No. 26 Joint Apprenticeship) and Training Trust Fund and its Trustees: Stephen Kelly; George Hogan; Joe Dabbs; Rich Murphy; Paul Henriqes; Thomas Myers; Joe Daley; Gregg Kaderabek; Kenn
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union No. 26, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Collection Agent: George Hogan
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Pension Trust Fund and its Trustees:Tom Myers; Michael Toman; Rich Murphy; George Hogan; Dave McKay; and Jon Eugenio
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Electrical Welfare Trust Fund and its Trustees: Brian Moorefield; Tom Myers; Joe Dabbs; Greg Warner; Paul Mella; and Francis DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Individual Account Fund: and its Trustees: James Marx; William Briggs; Joseph Richards; Kenneth Basset; Rich Murphy; and Joseph Dabbs
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee and its Trustees: James Marx; Rick Steele; Joe Dabbs; Larry Greenhill Sr.; Thang Nguyen; and Tim Miller
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Electrical Benefit Fund and its Trustees: Kenneth Cooper;David Long; Dennis Quebe; and Lonnie Stephenson
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Electrical Contractors Association Washington D.C. Chapter, Collection Agent: Jonathan Thomas
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Electrical Welfare Trust Fund and its Trustees
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Electrical Contractors Association Washington D.C. Chapter
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Local Labor Management Cooperation Committee and its Trustees
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Individual Account Fund
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union No. 26, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Electrical Benefit Fund and its Trustees
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The IBEW Local No. 26 Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund and its Trustees
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Electrical Workers Local No. 26 Pension Trust Fund and its Trustees
Represented By: Christopher Michael Leins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Electrical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Francis R Laws
Represented By: Sima Gavriella Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Tominovich, Jr., Registered Agent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?