Green v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing et al
Appellant: Daryl Anthony Green
Appellee: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Not in Its Individual Capacity but Solely as Certificate Trustee
Trustee: Timothy P. Branigan
Case Number: 8:2019cv03132
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 APPELLEES' DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Not in Its Individual Capacity but Solely as Certificate Trustee re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 AP #1 Complaint, #2 AP #1-1 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 AP #1-2 Exhibit, #4 AP #1-3 Cover Sheet, #5 AP #7 Motion to Dismiss, #6 AP #7-1 Proposed Order, #7 AP #7-2 Exhibit A, #8 AP #7-3 Exhibit B, #9 AP #7-4 Exhibit C, #10 AP #7-5 Exhibit D, #11 AP #7-6 Exhibit E, #12 AP #7-7 Exhibit F, #13 AP #7-8 Exhibit G, #14 AP #7-9 Exhibit H, #15 AP #7-10 Exhibit I, #16 AP #7-11 Exhibit J, #17 AP #7-12 Exhibit K, #18 AP #7-13 Exhibit L, #19 AP #9 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #20 AP #13 Motion for Reconsideration, #21 AP #13-1 Proposed Order, #22 AP #14 Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, #23 AP #15 Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, #24 AP #18 Notice of Appeal, #25 AP #21 Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal, #26 Docket Sheet, #27 Transmittal Sheet dated 12/17 (zip file with designated documents was not received), #28 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 DUPLICATE APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Daryl Anthony Green re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (filed to correct Deficiency Notice re Certificate of Service) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Letter regarding briefs (cm 12/17/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Daryl Anthony Green re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/27/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Notification Letter (cm 10/29/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Southern). Bankruptcy Court case number 19-00298, filed by Daryl Anthony Green. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Transmittal, #3 Docket Sheet)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Daryl Anthony Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Abood-Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Not in Its Individual Capacity but Solely as Certificate Trustee
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Abood-Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Timothy P. Branigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?