Randolph v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Sharon Randolph
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 8:2019cv03192
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Aughtman. Directing attorney Joseph Aughtman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kenneth Jay Grunfeld. Directing attorney Kenneth Jay Grunfeld to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Richard M Golomb. Directing attorney Richard M Golomb to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph H. Aughtman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8397421.) by Sharon Randolph(Plaxen, Bruce)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth J. Grunfeld (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8397405.) by Sharon Randolph(Plaxen, Bruce)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard M. Golomb (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8397386.) by Sharon Randolph(Plaxen, Bruce)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8328917.), filed by Sharon Randolph. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Plaxen, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randolph v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Randolph
Represented By: Bruce M Plaxen
Represented By: Joseph Aughtman
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Grunfeld
Represented By: Richard M Golomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?