Cade v. O'Sullivan, Esq et al
Plaintiff: Eric Cade
Defendant: Laura H.G. O'Sullivan, Esq and McCabe, Weisberg, & Conway, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv03260
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying ECF #3 MOTION to Remove a Civil Case to Federal Court by Eric Cade; DISMISSING CASE without prejudice; Case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/23/2019. (c/m 1/9/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #2 MOTION for Non - Judicial Temporary Restraining Order - Permanent Injunction & Demand for an Emergency Hearing. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/13/2019. (c/m ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Eric Cade re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Remove a Civil Case to Federal Court by Eric Cade (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Non - Judicial Temporary Restraining Order - Permanent Injunction & Demand for an Emergency Hearing by Eric Cade (Attachments: #1 Verification)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McCabe, Weisberg, & Conway, LLC, Laura H.G. O'Sullivan, Esq ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637035354.), filed by Eric Cade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cade v. O'Sullivan, Esq et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura H.G. O'Sullivan, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe, Weisberg, & Conway, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?