United States of America v. Zen Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Zen Enterprises, Inc., Zenaida Frasier, Potomac Driving School, Inc. and Benjamin Frasier
Case Number: 8:2019cv03294
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/20/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. United States of America or counsel for United States of America are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/4/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Benjamin Frasier, Zenaida Frasier, Potomac Driving School, Inc., Zen Enterprises, Inc.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Federal Taxes and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Zen Enterprises, Inc., #3 Summons for Potomac Driving School, Inc., #4 Summons for Benjamin Frasier, #5 Summons for Zenaida Frasier)(Miller, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Zen Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zen Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenaida Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potomac Driving School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Emily K Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?