Brooks v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Claudette D. Brook
Defendant: McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC, Joshua Aaron Welborn, Chasity Brown and Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv03305
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint With Prejudice filed by Claudette D. Brook. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Phillip)
December 20, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint With Prejudice by Freedom Mortgage Corporation(Todt, Jonathan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chasity Brown, McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC(Welborn, Joshua)
December 16, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Claudette D. Brook Notice of Partial Dismissal (Dismissing Joshua Welborn only) (Robinson, Phillip)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff shall have until December 11, 2019 to file a response to #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and/or Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 19-3305. (tb2s, Chambers)
December 13, 2019 Filing 30 Local Rule 103.5(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Todt, Jonathan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chasity Brown, Freedom Mortgage Corporation, McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC, filed by Claudette D. Brook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Comparison Copy of Amended Complaint)(Robinson, Phillip)
December 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand/or Motion for Summary Judgment by Claudette D. Brook. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Phillip)
November 26, 2019 Filing 27 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC (Welborn, Joshua)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Answer or otherwise Response to the Complaint is due on or before December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 11/21/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
November 20, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand/or Motion for Summary Judgment by Joshua Aaron Welborn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit)(Welborn, Joshua)
November 20, 2019 Filing 24 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Todt, Jonathan)
November 20, 2019 Deficiency Notice to Freedom Mortgage Corporation and McCabe Weisberg & Conway, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statements have not been filed. The Statements must be filed by 11/27/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time UNOPPOSED Motion of Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Todt, Jonathan)
November 15, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-17) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Reissued as to Chasity Brown, McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Lift Stay and Establish Briefing Schedule by Claudette Brooks, Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 20 Line request for new summons by Plaintiff as to Defendant Chasity Brown. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chasity Brown, Freedom Mortgage Corporation, McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC, Joshua Aaron Welborn, filed by Claudette Brooks.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT MOTION to Lift Stay and Establish Briefing Schedule by Freedom Mortgage Corporation and Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for an Order Permitting the Plaintiff to Deposit Disputed Insurance Proceeds into the Court Registry by Claudette Brooks. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 LINE NOTICE to the Court of Continued Stay by Plaintiff Claudette Brooks. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Defer Dismissal by Claudette Brooks. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION to Parties of Contemplated Dismissal (Lack of Jurisdiction). (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Reserving Ruling on #12 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joshua Aaron Welborn. Signed by Circuit Court Judge Leo E. Green, Jr. on 2/7/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION for Summary Judgment by Joshua Aaron Welborn. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay filed by Claudette Brooks.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation's #5 Motion to Temporarily Stay Proceedings. Signed by Circuit Court Judge John P. Davey on 1/8/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Chasity Brown.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Line Request by Plaintiff for new Summons as to Defendant Chasity Brown. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Claudette Brooks. Freedom Mortgage Corporation served on 12/11/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Claudette Brooks. Joshua Aaron Welborn served on 12/17/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Temporarily Stay Proceedings by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 30 days as to Chasity Brown, Joshua Aaron Welborn.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case Information Sheet (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Chasity Brown, Freedom Mortgage Corporation, McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC, Joshua Aaron Welborn, filed by Claudette Brooks.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL 18-36147. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8353161), filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A0 State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit A1 State Docket Entry 1, #4 Exhibit A2 State Docket Entry 2, #5 Exhibit A3 State Docket Entry 3, #6 Exhibit A4 State Docket Entry 4, #7 Exhibit A5 State Docket Entry 5, #8 Exhibit A6 State Docket Entry 6, #9 Exhibit A7 State Docket Entry 7, #10 Exhibit A8 State Docket Entry 8, #11 Exhibit A9 State Docket Entry 9, #12 Exhibit A10 State Docket Entry 10, #13 Exhibit A11 State Docket Entry 11, #14 Exhibit A12 State Docket Entry 12, #15 Exhibit A13 State Docket Entry 13, #16 Exhibit A14 State Docket Entry 14, #17 Exhibit A15 State Docket Entry 15, #18 Exhibit A16 State Docket Entry 16, #19 Exhibit A17 State Docket Entry 17, #20 Exhibit A18 State Docket Entry 18, #21 Exhibit A19 State Docket Entry 19, #22 Exhibit A20 State Docket Entry 20, #23 Exhibit A21 State Docket Entry 21, #24 Exhibit A22 State Docket Entry 22, #25 Exhibit A23 State Docket Entry 23, #26 Exhibit A24 State Docket Entry 24, #27 Exhibit A25 State Docket Entry 25, #28 Exhibit A26 State Docket Entry 26, #29 Exhibit A27 State Docket Entry 27, #30 Exhibit B - Chasity Brown Consent to Removal, #31 Exhibit C - Joshua Welborn Consent to Removal, #32 Exhibit D - McCabe Weisberg and Conway Consent to Removal)(Todt, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC
Represented By: Joshua Arron Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Aaron Welborn
Represented By: Joshua Arron Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasity Brown
Represented By: Joshua Arron Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Todt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette D. Brook
Represented By: Phillip R Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?