HIAS, Inc. et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc., Church World Service, Inc. and HIAS, Inc.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II, Chad Wolf, Michael R. Pompeo and Donald J. Trump
Interested Party: Phyllis Elliot Oakley, James Nelson Purcell, Jr., Arthur E. Dewey and Anne Claire Richard
Amicus Curiae: Cities, Mayors, and the United States Conference of Mayors, Jewish Council For Public Affairs and State of Maryland, et al.
Case Number: 8:2019cv03346
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05:706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 01/08/2020, before Judge Messitte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Renee Ewing, Telephone number 301-344-3227. Total number of pages filed: 128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2020.(re, Court Reporter)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction of Executive Order 13888. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/15/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. re Texas Veto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Texas Letter)(Keaney, Melissa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. re #64 Motion Hearing,, #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Executive Order 13888 & and the Funding Notice (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Justin)
January 9, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE by Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump, Chad Wolf re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Executive Order 13888 (Proposed Order) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Bradley)
January 8, 2020 Filing 64 Motions Hearing held on 1/8/2020 re #56 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Strike the Veprek Declaration (ECF No. 54-1) - Argued - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; and #18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Executive Order 13888 - Argued - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; Oral Order of the Court DIRECTING Plaintiffs Counsel to Submit a Proposed Order of Preliminary Injunction and Defendants Counsel to Submit a Proposed Order denying Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by noon on Friday, January 10, 2020, all as stated by and before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (Court Reporter: Renee Ewing) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 MOTION to Strike the Veprek Declaration (ECF No. 54-1) filed by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Oct. 24, 2019 Letter to Defendant Agencies)(Cox, Justin)
January 6, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. re #59 Order - Joint Notice Regarding Oral Argument (Cox, Justin)
January 3, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 MOTION to Strike the Veprek Declaration (ECF No. 54-1) filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump, Chad Wolf.(Humphreys, Bradley)
January 3, 2020 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Executive Order 13888 & the Funding Notice filed by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc..(Cox, Justin)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM ORDER to Counsel of Record regarding Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/30/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/26/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 24, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Justin)
December 24, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Strike the Veprek Declaration (ECF No. 54-1) by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.(Cox, Justin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda B Evarts on behalf of Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. (Evarts, Linda)
December 20, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Executive Order 13888 filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Humphreys, Bradley)
December 18, 2019 Filing 52 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #51 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Danielle L Goldstein. Directing attorney Danielle L Goldstein to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting #35 , #43 , and #45 Motion for Leave to File Amici curiae briefs.. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/16/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 51 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danielle L. Goldstein by Cities, Mayors, and the United States Conference of Mayors. The fee has already been paid.(Sangree, Suzanne)
December 16, 2019 Filing 50 QC NOTICE: #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Cities, Mayors, and the United States Conference of Mayors needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeff VanDam. Directing attorney Jeff VanDam to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jasleen Singh. Directing attorney Jasleen Singh to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vilma Palma-Solana. Directing attorney Vilma Palma-Solana to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jessica M Weisel. Directing attorney Jessica M Weisel to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Motion of Amici Jewish Council for Public Affairs, Catholic Charities USA, The Greater Milwaukee Synod of the Evangelical Lutheran Church In America, The St. Louis Jewish Community Relations Council, and Other Faith-Based Organizations for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jewish Council For Public Affairs (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tucci, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danielle L. Goldstein (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8405198.) by Cities, Mayors, and the United States Conference of Mayors(Sangree, Suzanne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Cities, Mayors, and the United States Conference of Mayors by Cities, Mayors, and the United States Conference of Mayors (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae Cities, Mayors, and the United States Conference of Mayors in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Sangree, Suzanne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Sangree on behalf of Cities, Mayors, and the United States Conference of Mayors (Sangree, Suzanne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeff VanDam (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8405103.) by State of Maryland, et al.(Dunlap, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jasleen K. Singh (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8405089.) by State of Maryland, et al.(Dunlap, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Vilma Palma-Solana (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8405053.) by State of Maryland, et al.(Dunlap, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 38 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jeffrey Paul Dunlap on behalf of State of Maryland, et al.(Dunlap, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 37 (FILED IN ERROR BY COUNSEL) Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jeffrey Paul Dunlap on behalf of State of Maryland, et al.(Dunlap, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/13/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
December 13, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by State of Maryland, et al. re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Executive Order 13888 Brief of Amici States (Dunlap, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Former State Department Officials by Arthur E. Dewey, James Nelson Purcell, Jr, Anne Claire Richard (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief of Former State Department Officials)(Schulman, Steven)
December 13, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jessica M. Weisel (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8404523.) by Arthur E. Dewey, James Nelson Purcell, Jr, Anne Claire Richard(Schulman, Steven)
December 13, 2019 Filing 33 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Steven H Schulman on behalf of Arthur E. Dewey, James Nelson Purcell, Jr, Anne Claire Richard(Schulman, Steven)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM ORDER to Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/9/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. RE Amici Curiae (Keaney, Melissa)
November 27, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariko Hirose on behalf of Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. (Hirose, Mariko)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM ORDER to Counsel of Record regarding briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/26/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 28 Telephone Conference (re status of case) held on 11/26/2019 for 30 minutes before Judge Peter J. Messitte. (jmhs, Chambers)
November 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Austin, Kathryn)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. (Cox, Justin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa S Keaney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Keaney, Melissa)
November 26, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statements, Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Court Order served on President Donald Trump, Secretary of State Michael Pompeo, Secretary of Health and Human Services Alex Azar, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security Chad Wolf, William P. Barr on November 21, 2019, filed by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc..(Cox, Justin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. re #10 Order & the Parties' Availability for a Telephonic Scheduling Conference (Cox, Justin)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Philip Humphreys on behalf of Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump, Chad Wolf (Humphreys, Bradley)
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Linda B Evarts. Directing attorney Linda B Evarts to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mariko Hirose. Directing attorney Mariko Hirose to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Process & ECF No. 10 served on U.S. Attorney on 11/22/19, filed by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc..(Cox, Justin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Executive Order 13888 by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A (Exec. Order), #3 Exhibit B (Funding Notice), #4 Exhibit C (Hetfield Decl.), #5 Exhibit D (McCullough Decl.), #6 Exhibit E (Vignarajah Decl.), #7 Exhibit F (Schwartz Decl.), #8 Exhibit G (Carey Decl.), #9 Exhibit H (Tr. of WH Press Call on Refugee Policy), #10 Exhibit I (Revision History of 8 U.S.C. 1522(a)), #11 Exhibit J (DOS Allocations Handbook), #12 Exhibit K (SCORR Letter to PRM & ORR), #13 Exhibit L (WH Fact Sheet on Refugee Policy))(Cox, Justin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Linda Evarts (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8366768.) by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.(Cox, Justin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mariko Hirose by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Cox, Justin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kathryn Austin. Directing attorney Kathryn Austin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 QC NOTICE: #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by HIAS, Inc., Church World Service, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Melissa S Keaney. Directing attorney Melissa S Keaney to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. re #10 Order (Cox, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued 60 days as to Alex M. Azar, II, Michael R. Pompeo, Donald J. Trump, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER to Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/21/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Church World Service, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. Proposed Summonses (Cox, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by HIAS, Inc., Church World Service, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons were provided for only the named Defendant. If the defendant is either an agency of the United States or an officer or employee of the United States, you must serve both the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland, as well as each defendant. Please electronically submit a summons for each required party, using the Civil event "Supplemental" located under "Other Filings", and then "Other Documents", and nd link Proposed summons to #1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kathryn S. Austin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8362219.) by CHURCH WORLD SERVICE, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.(Cox, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mariko Hirose (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8362202.) by CHURCH WORLD SERVICE, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.(Cox, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa S. Keaney (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8362183.) by CHURCH WORLD SERVICE, Inc., HIAS, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.(Cox, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Lutheran Family Services of Nebraska, Other Affiliate Refugee Services of Texas, Inc., Other Affiliate Ascentria Community Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Bethany Christian Services of Michigan, Other Affiliate Bethany Christian Services of Central Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Canopy of Northwest Arkansas, Other Affiliate Crittenton Services for Children and Families, Other Affiliate Inspiritus, Other Affiliate International Christian Adoption, Other Affiliate Lutheran Community Services Northwest, Other Affiliate Lutheran Family Services of the Rocky Mountains, Other Affiliate Lutheran Services Carolinas, Other Affiliate Lutheran Services Florida, Other Affiliate Lutheran Social Service of Minnesota, Other Affiliate Lutheran Social Services of NE Florida, Other Affiliate Lutheran Social Services of North Dakota, Other Affiliate Lutheran Social Services of South Dakota, Other Affiliate Lutheran Social Services of the National Capital Area, Other Affiliate Lutheran Social Services of the Southwest, Other Affiliate Lutheran Social Services of Wisconsin and Upper Michigan, Other Affiliate Samaritas, Other Affiliate Mohawk Valley Resource Center for Refugees for Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc..(Cox, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CHURCH WORLD SERVICE, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Opening Doors, Inc., Other Affiliate New American Pathways, Other Affiliate RefugeeOne, Other Affiliate Exodus Refugee/Immigration, Inc., Other Affiliate Kentucky Refugee Ministries, Inc., Other Affiliate Bethany Refugee Services, Other Affiliate Lutheran Family Services of Nebraska, Other Affiliate Ascentria Care Alliance, Other Affiliate Journeys End Refugee Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Community Refugee and Immigration Services, Other Affiliate Sponsors Organized to Assist Refugees, Other Affiliate Refugee Services of Texas, Inc. for CHURCH WORLD SERVICE, Inc..(Cox, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by HIAS, Inc. (Cox, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory & Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8362113.), filed by HIAS, Inc., CHURCH WORLD SERVICE, Inc., Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cox, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIAS, Inc. et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lutheran Immigration & Refugee Service, Inc.
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin
Represented By: Linda B Evarts
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church World Service, Inc.
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin
Represented By: Linda B Evarts
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIAS, Inc.
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin
Represented By: Linda B Evarts
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Melissa S Keaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Phyllis Elliot Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: James Nelson Purcell, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica M Weisel
Represented By: Steven H Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Arthur E. Dewey
Represented By: Jessica M Weisel
Represented By: Steven H Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Anne Claire Richard
Represented By: Jessica M Weisel
Represented By: Steven H Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cities, Mayors, and the United States Conference of Mayors
Represented By: Danielle L Goldstein
Represented By: Suzanne Sangree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jewish Council For Public Affairs
Represented By: Michael E Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Maryland, et al.
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Dunlap
Represented By: Vilma R Palma-Solana
Represented By: Jeff VanDam
Represented By: Jasleen K Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?