Davis v. Kim et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel F Davis and Nathaniel F. Davis, II
Defendant: Adam C Kim, J and H Beverage Inc. d/b/a Largo Liquors, Jay Chang Kim, Wallace Kent Roos, John Doe, Henry P. Stawinski, III, Venancio Garcia, Prince George's County Police Department, Brett Jamon, Seung Bong Han, Han M Kim, Han M. Kim, Unidentified Employees of J and H Beverage, Inc. d/b/a Largo Liquors, Prince George's County Police Lietenant Jamon, Venancio Gomez Garcia, Wallace Kent Roos, Jr., Adam C. Kim, Unknown Police Offiers Nos. 1, 2 and 3 and J and H Beverage Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv03605
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 1/24/2020. (Day, Charles)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 1/24/2020. (Day, Charles)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Prince George's County Police Department (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Answer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Shelley)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Venancio Gomez Garcia, J and H Beverage Inc., Han M. Kim, Jay Chang Kim, Unidentified Employees of J and H Beverage, Inc. d/b/a Largo Liquors (Hetherington, Robert)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Venancio Gomez Garcia, J and H Beverage Inc., Han M. Kim, Jay Chang Kim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hetherington, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Jay Chang Kim, Venancio Gomez Garcia, Han M. Kim, Unidentified Employees of J and H Beverage, Inc. d/b/a Largo Liquors, J and H Beverage Inc..(Hetherington, Robert)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County Police Department (Johnson, Shelley)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 12/27/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 12/27/19)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Nathaniel F. Davis, II, Venancio Gomez Garcia, Seung Bong Han, Adam C. Kim, Han M. Kim, Jay Chang Kim, Prince George's County Police Department, Wallace Kent Roos, Jr or counsel for Nathaniel F. Davis, II, Venancio Gomez Garcia, Seung Bong Han, Adam C. Kim, Han M. Kim, Jay Chang Kim, Prince George's County Police Department, Wallace Kent Roos, Jr are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 1/10/2020. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 12/27/19)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 12/27/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (3) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Venancio Gomez Garcia, Seung Bong Han, J and H Beverage Inc., Adam C. Kim, Han M. Kim, Jay Chang Kim, Prince George's County Police Department, Prince George's County Police Lietenant Jamon, Wallace Kent Roos, Jr, Henry P. Stawinski, III, Unidentified Employees of J and H Beverage, Inc. d/b/a Largo Liquors, Unknown Police Offiers Nos. 1, 2 and 3, filed by Nathaniel F. Davis, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Cover Page for USB Drive (USB Drive was not submitted to USDC), #3 (disregard) Attachment, #4 Exhibit 8)(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2019: #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7) (kns, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 12/27/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL19-19278 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8418047), filed by Prince George's County Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Request for Waiver of Prepaid Costs, #2 Order Regarding Waiver of Prepaid Costs, #3 Summons Issued, #4 Line Requesting Reissuance of Summons, #5 Summons Reissued and Recalled, #6 Summons Reissued, #7 Summons Reissued, #8 Notice to Parties of Contemplated Dismissal, #9 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #10 Civil Case Closure Form, #11 Certification of State Court File, #12 Prince George's County Circuit Court Civil Case Summary, #13 Consent to Removal, #14 USDC Docket Sheet, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 [FILED IN ERROR] COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8418047.), filed by Nathaniel F Davis. (Attachments: #1 Request for Waiver of Fees, #2 Order granting Waiver of Fees)(Johnson, Shelley) Modified on 12/27/2019 (kns, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Kim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam C Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J and H Beverage Inc. d/b/a Largo Liquors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Chang Kim
Represented By: Robert B Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Kent Roos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry P. Stawinski, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venancio Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County Police Department
Represented By: Shelley Lynn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Jamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seung Bong Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Han M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Han M. Kim
Represented By: Robert B Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Employees of J and H Beverage, Inc. d/b/a Largo Liquors
Represented By: Robert B Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County Police Lietenant Jamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venancio Gomez Garcia
Represented By: Robert B Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Kent Roos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Police Offiers Nos. 1, 2 and 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J and H Beverage Inc.
Represented By: Robert B Hetherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel F Davis
Represented By: Christina J. Bostick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel F. Davis, II
Represented By: Christina J. Bostick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?