Henson v. Parikh et al
Plaintiff: Judy Annette Henson
Defendant: Ameet Sharad Parikh and Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., P.C.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00062
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimwithin the Applicable Statutory Time Period filed by Judy Annette Henson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Skinner, Stephen)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., P.C., Ameet Sharad Parikh identifying Corporate Parent Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., Other Affiliate EMA Holdings, P.C., Other Affiliate Martin Brown, M.D. for Ameet Sharad Parikh, Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., P.C..(Petty, Elliott)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimwithin the Applicable Statutory Time Period by Ameet Sharad Parikh(Petty, Elliott)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #6 Motion for Disclosure filed by Ameet Sharad Parikh, Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., P.C. was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings Other Documents Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 [FILED IN ERROR] MOTION for Disclosure Of Corporate Affiliations And Financial Interests by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., P.C., Ameet Sharad Parikh(Magdeburger, Natalie) Modified on 2/10/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., P.C., Ameet Sharad Parikh.(Magdeburger, Natalie)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kelly R Reed. Directing attorney Kelly R Reed to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kelly R. Reed (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8479149.) by Judy Annette Henson(Skinner, Stephen)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., P.C. and Ameet Sharad Parikh. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Paula Xinis. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., P.C., Ameet Sharad Parikh ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8443588.), filed by Judy Annette Henson, as Adminstratix of the Estate of David Wayne Henson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Skinner, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henson v. Parikh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameet Sharad Parikh
Represented By: Elliott Daryl Petty
Represented By: Natalie C Magdeburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A., P.C.
Represented By: Natalie C Magdeburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Annette Henson
Represented By: Stephen Gibson Skinner
Represented By: Kelly R Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?