Alertus Technologies, LLC v. Desktop Alert Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alertus Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Howard Ryan and Desktop Alert Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00154
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephanie S Spangler. Directing attorney Stephanie S Spangler to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph A Farco. Directing attorney Joseph A Farco to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeanne M. Hamburg. Directing attorney Jeanne M. Hamburg to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephanie S. Spangler (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8567267.) by Desktop Alert Inc., Howard Ryan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carrier, William)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph A. Farco (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8567246.) by Desktop Alert Inc., Howard Ryan(Carrier, William)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeanne M. Hamburg (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8567206.) by Desktop Alert Inc., Howard Ryan(Carrier, William)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint; Answer is due on or before April 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/9/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Desktop Alert Inc., Howard Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carrier, William)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alertus Technologies, LLC. Howard Ryan served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020.(Neary, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alertus Technologies, LLC. Desktop Alert Inc. served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020.(Neary, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 Correspondence mailed to Register of Copyrights (c/m 1/31/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/21/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Desktop Alert Inc., Howard Ryan.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Alertus Technologies, LLC (Neary, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Desktop Alert Inc., Howard Ryan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8461473.), filed by Alertus Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Neary, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alertus Technologies, LLC v. Desktop Alert Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alertus Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Michael John Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desktop Alert Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?