Sterling Mirror Company, LLC v. The Jordan Glass Corporation
Plaintiff: Sterling Mirror Company, LLC
Defendant: The Jordan Glass Corporation
Case Number: 8:2020cv00210
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER ORDER directing the Parties to submit a Proposed Confidentiality Order for the Court's review and approval. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/18/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2020 Filing 19 Correspondence re: Letter Reply regarding Motion to Compel (Esworthy, Matthew)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 Correspondence re: Letter in Opposition to Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Crossan, James)
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 Correspondence re: Joint Letter in Support of Motion to Compel (Esworthy, Matthew)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MARGINAL ORDER approving #15 Joint Correspondence re: Proposed Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/27/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 Joint Correspondence re: Proposed Briefing Schedule (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Esworthy, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER memorializing today's telephone conference. Sterling Mirror Company, LLC and Luoyang Gangxin Glass Technology Co., LTD., (parties in the related case pending before me, Sterling Mirror Company, LLC v. Xiaogang et al, 19-2638) may file a joint letter of three pages or less, single-spaced, excluding exhibits, in support of Sterling Mirror's motion to compel. Jordan Glass may file a letter of 3 pages or less, single-spaced, excluding exhibits, in response. Sterling Mirror and Gangxin may then file a joint letter in reply of 2 pages or less, single-spaced, excluding exhibits. The parties will submit a proposed briefing schedule for these letters by February 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/19/2020.(pk3s, Chambers)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE on February 19, 2020 at 3:30pm. Plaintiff's counsel is DIRECTED to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/5/2020. (ats, Chambers)
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Johnson. Directing attorney Christopher Johnson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Johnson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8495198.) by The Jordan Glass Corporation(Crossan, James)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Crossan on behalf of The Jordan Glass Corporation (Crossan, James)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Neeb on behalf of Sterling Mirror Company, LLC (Neeb, Bethany)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Anselm Sodaro Esworthy on behalf of Sterling Mirror Company, LLC (Esworthy, Matthew)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/29/2020. (c/m 1/29/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 Transfer Notification Letter (c/m to counsel for both parties 1/24/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:20-mc-20262. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 1/24/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
January 23, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (kpe)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Transferring Case. Order granting #3 Motion to Transfer. This matter shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case by STERLING MIRROR COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Attorney Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D to Affidavit, #6 Exhibit E to Affidavit, #7 Exhibit F to Affidavit, #8 Exhibit G to Affidavit, #9 Exhibit 2, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Kain, Robert)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams (ebz)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 First Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District Subpoena Directed to The Jordan Glass Corporation. Filing fee $47.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-12318904, payment transferred from : 20cv60115, filed by STERLING MIRROR COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Attorney Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D to Affidavit, #6 Exhibit E to Affidavit, #7 Exhibit F to Affidavit, #8 Exhibit G to Affidavit, #9 Exhibit 2, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kain, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterling Mirror Company, LLC v. The Jordan Glass Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Mirror Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jordan Glass Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?