McGraw v. Nutter et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Marie McGraw
Defendant: Kathy Nutter, Michelle Lekan, Rhoshedda Proctor and Valerie Stone
Case Number: 8:2020cv00265
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Supplement to #1 Complaint, filed by Wanda Marie McGraw (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Wanda Marie McGraw. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order to Supplement the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 2/14/2020. (c/m 2/14/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michelle Lekan, Kathy Nutter, Rhoshedda Proctor, Valerie Stone (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637121065), filed by Wanda Marie McGraw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Attachment 3, #5 Attachment 4, #6 Attachment 5, #7 Attachment 6, #8 Summons, #9 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGraw v. Nutter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Nutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Lekan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhoshedda Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Marie McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?