Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund et al v. RGC General Engineering, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund and Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan
Defendant: RGC General Engineering, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00426
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court has reviewed #9 Notice of Intent to File Motion for Default Judgment and has determined that no pre-motion conference is necessary. Plaintiff is granted leave to file the proposed Motion, which will be deemed timely if filed by May 15, 2020. If in order to meet this deadline, counsel will have to violate any shelter-in-place orders, Plaintiff should request an extension. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/9/2020. (nrs, Chambers)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund, Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan. RGC General Engineering, Inc. served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020.(Hawkins, Jennifer)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan, Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund of Intent to File Motion (Hawkins, Jennifer)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/27/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 2/24/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan, Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund or counsel for Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan, Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/9/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to RGC General Engineering, Inc.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan (Hawkins, Jennifer)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund (Hawkins, Jennifer)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RGC General Engineering, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8522128.), filed by Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund, Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hawkins, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund et al v. RGC General Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Jennifer Bush Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Electrical Annuity Plan
Represented By: Jennifer Bush Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGC General Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?