Reynolds v. Deutsche Bank National Trust
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Appellant: Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00470
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Letter to parties regarding briefs. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 4/22/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/13/2020, before Bankruptcy Judge Lori S. Simpson. Total number of pages filed: 30. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 AP #26-1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 APPELLANT DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, Appellant Brief due by 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 AP #25-1 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #2 AP #25-2 Plausibility Standard, #3 AP #25-3 Exhibit A, #4 AP #25-4 Exhibit B, #5 AP #25-5 Exhibit C, #6 AP #25-6 Exhibit D, #7 AP #25-7 Exhibit E, #8 AP #25-9 Exhibit 2, #9 AP #25-10 Exhibit 3, #10 AP #25-11 Exhibit 4, #11 AP #25-12 Exhibit 5, #12 AP #25-13 Exhibit 6, #13 AP #25-14 Exhibit 7, #14 Adversary Proceeding Docket Sheet, #15 Bankruptcy Case Docket Sheet, #16 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Notification Letter (c/m 3/6/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 19-15176,, filed by Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Order being appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Deutsche Bank National Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Represented By: Daniel A Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Samuel C. Reynolds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?