Sherbert v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Sherbert
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc. and Akeem Franks
Case Number: 8:2020cv00605
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 16 [FILED IN ERROR] QC NOTICE: #15 Amended Complaint filed by Joseph Sherbert needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Motion for leave to file amended complaint is required. Please file the motion for leave to file as the main document, and the clean version of the amended complaint and redline version as two separate attachments to the motion. Also, parties are not listed individually on the amended complaint. Please re-file the clean version of the amended complaint and redline version with the parties listed individually when you file the Motion for Leave to File. Do not use et al. Thank you. (tds, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/3/2020 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Sherbert. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Romberger, Timothy) Modified on 4/3/2020 (tds, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 4/3/2020 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/25/2020. (Attachment: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/25/2020. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued 21 days as to Akeem Franks. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Joseph Sherbert of Request for Issuance of federal court summons to Defendant Akeem Franks (Romberger, Timothy)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Balsam, Ethan)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Joseph Sherbert (Romberger, Timothy)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of America, Inc., Other Affiliate UPS Worldwide Forwarding, Inc. for United Parcel Service, Inc..(Balsam, Ethan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Balsam, Ethan)
March 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy William Romberger on behalf of Joseph Sherbert (Romberger, Timothy)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eunju Park on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc. (Park, Eunju)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/5/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/5/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Akeem Franks, United Parcel Service, Inc., filed by Joseph Sherbert.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Prince George's County Circuit Court, case number CAL20-03578. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8553215), filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Notice to Plaintiff, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 State Court Information Sheet, #5 State Court Summons, #6 State Court Notice of Service, #7 State Court Notice of Filing Removal)(Balsam, Ethan)
March 5, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherbert v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Balsam
Represented By: Eunju Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akeem Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sherbert
Represented By: Ruth Ann Grace Azeredo
Represented By: Timothy William Romberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?