Goode v. Taylor
Plaintiff: Kevin Goode, Sr.
Defendant: Keene Taylor, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01045
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #3 Affidavit of Service filed by Kevin Goode, Sr. was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. *** Please use the event Summons Returned Executed so that the answer due date is automatically populated into the docket text. Thank you. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 Paperless Correspondence scheduling a Rule 16 conference call for Tuesday June 23, 2020 at 4:30PM. Please dial in on (877) 810-9415 access code 5860700 (jw2s, Chambers)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Keene Taylor, Jr. identifying Corporate Parent Erie Insurance for Keene Taylor, Jr..(Forte, Andre)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Keene Taylor, Jr..(Forte, Andre)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Keen Taylor Jr. on 5/25/20, filed by Kevin Goode, Sr..(Lapidus, Lawrence) Modified on 6/15/2020 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Keene Taylor, Jr. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8622297.), filed by Kevin Goode, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lapidus, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goode v. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Goode, Sr.
Represented By: Lawrence S Lapidus
Represented By: Michael Gary Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keene Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Andre M Forte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?