Boyer v. Iser et al
Plaintiff: Michael R. Boyer
Defendant: Case Management Richard Roderick, B. Cornachia, Warden Frank Bishop, J. McMahan, Russell Neverdon, William Thomas, Captain Walter Iser and Deputy Director Robin Woolford
Interested Party: Division of Correction
Case Number: 8:2020cv01260
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Return Pleading ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(c/m 7/9/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael R. Boyer (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunctive relief; granting #7 Motion to File an Amended Complaint; denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel; directing the Finance Officer to file an inmate account summary. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/6/2020. (c/m 7/6/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Michael R. Boyer (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended #1 Complaint by Michael R. Boyer (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #3 Order, filed by Division of Correction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Conners, Sharon)
June 9, 2020 Remark; Docket sheet and ECF #3 mailed to Plaintiff per Staff Attorney request. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 Correspondence requesting a status report filed by Michael Boyer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon E Conners on behalf of Division of Correction (Conners, Sharon)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order to either pay the filing fee or to file a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; directing counsel to show cause within 28 days of the date of this order why injunctive relief should not be granted. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/22/2020. (c/m w/forms and as directed 5/22/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/21/2020. (c/m 5/21/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael R. Boyer.(jj2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyer v. Iser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Management Richard Roderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Cornachia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Frank Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. McMahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Neverdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Walter Iser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Director Robin Woolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Division of Correction
Represented By: Sharon E Conners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?