Precigen, Inc. et al v. Zhang
Plaintiff: Precigen, Inc. and PGEN Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant: Shuyuan Zhang
Case Number: 8:2020cv01454
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Joint STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Extending Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 7/9/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION re #36 Stipulation and Order, #33 Order, #24 Memorandum Opinion, Temporary Restraining Order Joint Stipulation Extending TRO by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc.(Redd, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 37 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Andrews, Philip)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/23/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2020 Filing 35 STIPULATION re #33 Order, #24 Memorandum Opinion, Temporary Restraining Order Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc.(Andrews, Philip)
June 17, 2020 Check Received on 6/17/2020 from INTREXON CORPORATION. Receipt No. 14637123120, Check Number: 39296. Amount: $10,208.00. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/17/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Clarifying Scope of Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/16/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Lawrence Beizer on behalf of Shuyuan Zhang (Beizer, Richard)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER directing plaintiffs to pay a bond in the amount of $10,208; directing the Clerk's Office to place the bond in the Court's registry. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/12/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2020 Filing 30 Status Report Submitted (Joint) regarding Scheduling by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Redd, Justin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE re #27 Response, #24 Memorandum Opinion, Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Request for Bond filed by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc..(Redd, Justin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 28 Telephone Conference held on 6/9/2020 before Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (jw2s, Chambers)
June 10, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE re #24 Memorandum Opinion, Temporary Restraining Order filed by Shuyuan Zhang.(Rhoad, Robert)
June 9, 2020 Filing 26 Paperless Correspondence: The conference call for today June 9, 2020 will begin at 5:45PM. Please dial in on (877) 810-9415 access code 5860700 (jw2s, Chambers)
June 9, 2020 Filing 25 Paperless Correspondence Scheduling a conference call for June 9, 2020 at 5:30PM. Please dial in on (877) 810-9415 use access code 5860700 (jw2s, Chambers)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/9/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David A Kelly. Directing attorney David A Kelly to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew J Victor. Directing attorney Andrew J Victor to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andy Liu. Directing attorney Andy Liu to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Leah Seigel. Directing attorney Leah Seigel to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Deborah Pollack-Milgate. Directing attorney Deborah Pollack-Milgate to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Seal Notice of Filing of Supplemental Exhibits in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redd, Justin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 17 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Notice of Filing Under Seal of Supplemental Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc. re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Redd, Justin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 Motion Hearing held on 6/8/2020 before Judge George Jarrod Hazel re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Precigen, Inc., PGEN Therapeutics, Inc. (Court Reporter: Cindy Davis) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' Line Filing Declaration of Forensic Examiner Stacey Randolph (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A Declaration of Stacey Randolph)(Redd, Justin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Shuyuan Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Zhang Declaration, #2 Exhibit Hilbert Declaration)(Rhoad, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Victor (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8686877.) by Shuyuan Zhang(Rhoad, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andy Liu (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8686510.) by Shuyuan Zhang(Rhoad, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas Rhoad on behalf of Shuyuan Zhang (Rhoad, Robert)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 Correspondence re: Certification of Notice to Defendant of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Redd, Justin)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Paperless ORDER: The Court has quickly reviewed Plaintiffs submission and does not see any indication of compliance with Rule 65(a)(1) or (b)(1) regarding notice to the defendant. As soon as is practicable, please provide the Court with information sufficient to determine that the defendant has received notice and to allow the court to convene a conference call with both parties to schedule a hearing. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/4/2020. (jw2s, Chambers)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to Shuyuan Zhang.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, Philip)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Precigen, Inc., Other Affiliate GenVec LLC, Other Affiliate MabLogix, LLC, Other Affiliate Genomatix, Inc. for PGEN Therapeutics, Inc..(Andrews, Philip)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Precigen, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Exemplar Genetics, LLC, Other Affiliate Intrexon AB, Co., Other Affiliate Intrexon CEU, Inc., Other Affiliate Intrexon Energy Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate XON Cells, Inc., Other Affiliate Intrexon Energy Partners II, LLC, Other Affiliate PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Other Affiliate TransOva Genetics L.C., Other Affiliate MBP Titan LLC, Other Affiliate Precigen ActoBio Inc., Other Affiliate Triple-Gene LLC for Precigen, Inc..(Andrews, Philip)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Kelly (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8681951.) by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc.(Andrews, Philip)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leah Seigel (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8681950.) by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc.(Andrews, Philip)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Deborah Pollack-Milgate (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8681948.) by PGEN Therapeutics, Inc., Precigen, Inc.(Andrews, Philip)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified, for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Shuyuan Zhang ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8681907.), filed by Precigen, Inc., PGEN Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precigen, Inc. et al v. Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precigen, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Akihiko Redd
Represented By: Philip M Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PGEN Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Philip M Andrews
Represented By: Justin Akihiko Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shuyuan Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?