Green v. Prince George's County Office of Child Support
Appellant: Daryl Anthony Green
Trustee: Timothy P. Branigan
Appellee: Prince George's County Office of Child Support
Case Number: 8:2020cv01765
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that within ten (10) days from the date of this Order plaintiff must submit the designation and statement to the Court and must also submit a statement explaining his prolonged delay in filing those documents. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/21/2020. (c/m 7/22/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/22/2020 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Notification Letter sent to Appellant. (c/m 6/11/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 19-13565,, filed by Daryl Anthony Green. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Prince George's County Office of Child Support
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Daryl Anthony Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Timothy P. Branigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Prince George's County Office of Child Support
Represented By: Glenna Elizabeth Barner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?