Vaseleros-Stevenson v. Calvert County, Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Christy Vaseleros-Stevenson
Defendant: Timothy Price, Maryland Calvert County, Timothy Lewis and Calvert County, Maryland
Case Number: 8:2020cv01917
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #9 Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Dispositive Motions (until 8/31/2020). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/18/2020. (jmhs, Chambers)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 Corrected REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions to Dismiss (Schimel, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions to Dismiss (Schimel, Richard)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time by Timothy Lewis (until 8/4/2020). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/6/2020. (jmhs, Chambers)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Calvert County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Breads, John)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Timothy Lewis (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Peter, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Timothy Lewis(Peter, Matthew)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Calvert County, Maryland, Timothy Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8723550.), filed by Christy Vaseleros-Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Schimel, Richard)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8723532.), filed by Christy Vaseleros-Stevenson.(Schimel, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaseleros-Stevenson v. Calvert County, Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Calvert County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Lewis
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvert County, Maryland
Represented By: John F Breads, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Vaseleros-Stevenson
Represented By: Richard E Schimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?