United States of America v. Real Property Located In Potomac, Maryland, Commonly Known As 9908 Bentcross Drive, Potomac, Md 20854 And All Appurtenances, Improvements, And Attachments Located Thereon, And Any Property Traceable T
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located In Potomac, Maryland, Commonly Known As 9908 Bentcross Drive, Potomac, Md 20854 And All Appurtenances, Improvements, And Attachments Located Thereon, And Any Property Traceable T and Real Property Located in Potomac, Maryland Commonly Known As 9908 Bentcross Drive, Potomac MD 20854 and All Appurtenances, Improvements Located thereon, and All Rental and other Income Generated by th
Case Number: 8:2020cv02071
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Real Property Located In Potomac, Maryland, Commonly Known As 9908 Bentcross Drive, Potomac, Md 20854 And All Appurtenances, Improvements, And Attachments Located Thereon, And All Rental and Other Income Generated by the Property, or Any Property Traceable Thereto, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Redline version of Amended Complaint)(heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/25/2020 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #4 motion for leave to file amended complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/25/2020. (Chasanow, Deborah)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File to file Amended Complaint by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redline)(Wine, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of New Case Number from Circuit Court for Montgomery County Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 [FILED IN ERROR] WARRANT for Arrest in Rem issued. (Attachments: #1 USM - 285) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) cs to USM on 7/16/2020 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/17/2020 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for FORFEITURE Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem against Real Property Located In Potomac, Maryland, Commonly Known As 9908 Bentcross Drive, Potomac, Md 20854 And All Appurtenances, Improvements, And Attachments Located Thereon, And Any Property Traceable T, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wine, Jennifer)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located In Potomac, Maryland, Commonly Known As 9908 Bentcross Drive, Potomac, Md 20854 And All Appurtenances, Improvements, And Attachments Located Thereon, And Any Property Traceable T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located In Potomac, Maryland, Commonly Known As 9908 Bentcross Drive, Potomac, Md 20854 And All Appurtenances, Improvements, And Attachments Located Thereon, And Any Property Traceable T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located in Potomac, Maryland Commonly Known As 9908 Bentcross Drive, Potomac MD 20854 and All Appurtenances, Improvements Located thereon, and All Rental and other Income Generated by th
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer L Wine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?