Casa De Maryland, Inc. et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services, Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Centro Legal de la Raza and Casa De Maryland, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Chad F. Wolf
Amicus Curiae: KIND (Kids In Need of Defense), Morton Rosenberg, Oxfam America, Constitutional Accountability Center, State of New York, University of Maryland Carey Immigration Clinic and District of Columbia
Case Number: 8:2020cv02118
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Linda Evarts (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8868799.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 08/28/2020, before Judge Paula Xinis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Marlene Kerr, Telephone number 301-344-3499. Total number of pages filed: 119. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2020.(mmk, Court Reporter)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #62 Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendants' August 21, 2020 Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/11/2020. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #23 Motion to Stay pending judicial review and granting #38 , #39 , #40 , #42 and #44 Motions for Leave to File amicus curiae briefs. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/11/2020. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/11/2020. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2020 Filing 68 RESPONSE re #64 Order, #66 Response filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf.(Andersen, Jane)
September 4, 2020 Filing 67 RESPONSE re #64 Order, #65 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, filed by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (index), #2 Exhibit B (cumulative table of authorities))(Hirose, Mariko)
September 2, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE re #64 Order filed by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services.(Mark, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Dates Under 5 U.S.C. 705 , RESPONSE re #64 Order filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Andersen, Jane)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 LETTER ORDER directing parties to submit pleadings. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/31/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 63 Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2020 before Judge Paula Xinis re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Dates Under 5 U.S.C. 705 filed by Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project. (Court Reporter: Marlene Kerr) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File / PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' AUGUST 21, 2020 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Draft Supplemental Letter Brief)(Mark, Richard)
August 24, 2020 Filing 61 Request for Hearing re #59 Substantive legal issues - addressing, #54 Substantive legal issues - addressing, #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Dates Under 5 U.S.C. 705 requesting status conference today on TRO and related matters (Hirose, Mariko)
August 21, 2020 Filing 60 RESPONSE re #53 Order and in Further Opposition to Plainitffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Andersen, Jane)
August 21, 2020 Filing 59 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Moreno, Dennise)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/21/2020. (tb2s, Chambers)
August 20, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf(Andersen, Jane)
August 18, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/14/2020, before Judge Paula Xinis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Marlene Kerr, Telephone number 3013443499. Total number of pages filed: 100. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020.(mmk, Court Reporter)
August 17, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE re #53 Order filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf.(Andersen, Jane)
August 17, 2020 Filing 54 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hirose, Mariko)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER ORDER directing parties to submit pleadings on or before August 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/14/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 52 Motions Hearing held on 8/14/2020 before Judge Paula Xinis. (Court Reporter: Marlene Kerr-via Zoom) (ss5s, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Attachment GAO Decision dated August 14, 2020)(Cox, Justin)
August 13, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services - Notice of Additional Authority (Attachments: #1 La Clinica Decision)(Mark, Richard)
August 10, 2020 Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Keren Zwick. Directing attorney Keren Zwick to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2020 Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Xiaonan April Hu. Directing attorney Xiaonan April Hu to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Dates Under 5 U.S.C. 705 filed by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services.(Hirose, Mariko)
August 7, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennise Moreno on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Moreno, Dennise)
August 6, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf of Supplemental Authority (Andersen, Jane)
August 3, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File amicus brief in support of Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction. by Oxfam America, University of Maryland Carey Immigration Clinic(Sweeney, Maureen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Oxfam America, University of Maryland Carey Immigration Clinic(Sweeney, Maureen) Modified on 8/4/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
August 3, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by District of Columbia, State of New York (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief for States and Localities as Amici Curiae)(Levitz, Philip)
August 3, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Dates Under 5 U.S.C. 705 filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Juliana Blackwell, #2 Affidavit Neal Swartz)(Andersen, Jane)
August 3, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Morton Rosenberg (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amicus Brief)(Jones, Robert Stanton)
August 3, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by KIND (Kids In Need of Defense) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amicus Curiae Brief by Nonprofit Immigration Advocates and Legal and Social Service Providers, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Moreno, Gabriel)
August 3, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Constitutional Accountability Center (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amicus Brief)(Zolle, Dayna)
August 3, 2020 Filing 37 Final MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Keren Hart Zwick (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8787836.) by KIND (Kids In Need of Defense) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment in Response to paragraph 2.)(Moreno, Gabriel)
August 3, 2020 Filing 36 Final MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Xiaonan April Hu (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8787469.) by KIND (Kids In Need of Defense)(Moreno, Gabriel)
July 31, 2020 Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Philip J Levitz. Directing attorney Philip J Levitz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/31/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2020 Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Geroline A Castillo. Directing attorney Geroline A Castillo to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/31/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza. All Defendants.(Hirose, Mariko)
July 30, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; Chad F. Wolf served on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020.(Hirose, Mariko)
July 30, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Philip J. Levitz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8782266.) by District of Columbia, State of New York(Rock, Jimmy)
July 30, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services re #5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement, #8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement, #12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard W. Mark (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8768757.), #7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement, #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Evall (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8768762.), #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mariko Hirose (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8764245.), #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary Manfredi (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8767296.), #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kathryn S. Austin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8764458.), #9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement, #6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement, #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine Marquart (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8768766.), #22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Geroline A. Castillo (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8771790.), #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Conchita Cruz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8767266.) (Hirose, Mariko)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Amended SCHEDULING ORDER:a virtual hearing is scheduled for August 14, 2020 at 11:00 am. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/27/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: a virtual hearing is scheduled for August 11, 2020 at 11:00 am. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/27/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services re #24 Affidavit,,,, #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Dates Under 5 U.S.C. 705 (Hirose, Mariko)
July 24, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Elizabeth Andersen on behalf of All Defendants (Andersen, Jane)
July 24, 2020 Filing 25 PAPERLESS NOTICE: A recorded conference call has been scheduled for July 27, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. Instructions were emailed to the Parties. (tb2s, Chambers)
July 24, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re #23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay Effective Dates Under 5 U.S.C. 705 by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary Table, #2 Exhibit Timeline Repeal Rule, #3 Exhibit Broader EAD Rule, #4 Exhibit CASA Declaration, #5 Exhibit ASAP Declaration, #6 Exhibit Centro Legal Declaration, #7 Exhibit Oasis Declaration, #8 Exhibit Pangea Declaration, #9 Exhibit Donald J. Trump Memorandum, #10 Exhibit Martin Article (1995), #11 Exhibit Martin Article (2000), #12 Exhibit Martin Article (1990), #13 Exhibit CIS Ombudsman Annual Report, #14 Exhibit Nielsen Resignation Letter, #15 Exhibit DHS Orders of Succession, #16 Exhibit Executive Order 13753, #17 Exhibit Amendment to DHS Order of Succession, #18 Exhibit NIJC Comment, #19 Exhibit IJN Comment, #20 Exhibit State Comment, #21 Exhibit City of New York Comment, #22 Exhibit Members of Congress Comment, #23 Exhibit LSS-NY Comment, #24 Exhibit MIRC Comment, #25 Exhibit RAICES Comment, #26 Exhibit McLaughlin Comment)(Hirose, Mariko)
July 24, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Stay Effective Dates Under 5 U.S.C. 705 by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Index of Exhibits)(Hirose, Mariko)
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Geroline A. Castillo (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8771790.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katherine Marquart. Directing attorney Katherine Marquart to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Evall. Directing attorney Joseph Evall to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Richard W. Mark. Directing attorney Richard W. Mark to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Zachary Manfredi. Directing attorney Zachary Manfredi to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Conchita Cruz. Directing attorney Conchita Cruz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin. Directing attorney Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mariko Hirose. Directing attorney Mariko Hirose to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine Marquart (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8768766.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Evall (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8768762.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard W. Mark (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8768757.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary Manfredi (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8767296.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Conchita Cruz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8767266.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pangea Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Oasis Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Centro Legal de la Raza (Cox, Justin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project (Cox, Justin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Casa De Maryland, Inc. (Cox, Justin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 60 days as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kathryn S. Austin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8764458.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mariko Hirose (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8764245.) by Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Casa De Maryland, Inc., Centro Legal de la Raza, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services (Cox, Justin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory & Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8764158.), filed by Casa De Maryland, Inc., Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project, Oasis Legal Services, Pangea Legal Services, Centro Legal de la Raza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cox, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casa De Maryland, Inc. et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oasis Legal Services
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin
Represented By: Richard Mark
Represented By: Joseph Evall
Represented By: Conchita Cruz
Represented By: Katie Marquart
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Zachary Manfredi
Represented By: Geroline A Castillo
Represented By: Dennise Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pangea Legal Services
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin
Represented By: Richard Mark
Represented By: Joseph Evall
Represented By: Conchita Cruz
Represented By: Katie Marquart
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Zachary Manfredi
Represented By: Geroline A Castillo
Represented By: Dennise Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asylum Seeker Advocacy Project
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin
Represented By: Richard Mark
Represented By: Joseph Evall
Represented By: Conchita Cruz
Represented By: Katie Marquart
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Zachary Manfredi
Represented By: Geroline A Castillo
Represented By: Dennise Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centro Legal de la Raza
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin
Represented By: Richard Mark
Represented By: Joseph Evall
Represented By: Conchita Cruz
Represented By: Katie Marquart
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Zachary Manfredi
Represented By: Geroline A Castillo
Represented By: Dennise Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casa De Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Justin B Cox
Represented By: Kathryn Shu-yeng Austin
Represented By: Richard Mark
Represented By: Joseph Evall
Represented By: Conchita Cruz
Represented By: Katie Marquart
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Zachary Manfredi
Represented By: Geroline A Castillo
Represented By: Dennise Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KIND (Kids In Need of Defense)
Represented By: Xiaonan April Hu
Represented By: Gabriel Moreno
Represented By: Keren Hart Zwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Morton Rosenberg
Represented By: Robert Stanton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oxfam America
Represented By: Maureen A Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Constitutional Accountability Center
Represented By: Dayna Jennifer Zolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of New York
Represented By: Jimmy Rock
Represented By: Philip J Levitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of Maryland Carey Immigration Clinic
Represented By: Maureen A Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: District of Columbia
Represented By: Philip J Levitz
Represented By: Jimmy Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?