Michel v. FMS Financial Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Florence Michel
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and FMS Financial Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02205
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 Status Report Submitted by Florence Michel (Mack, Joseph)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/14/2021.. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/1/2020. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Appel, Renee)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Einstein, Joy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by FMS Financial Solutions, LLC.(Canter, Ronald)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #7 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., FMS Financial Solutions, LLC.(Einstein, Joy)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/11/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 8/31/2020.. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/6/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by FMS Financial Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Canter, Ronald)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by FMS Financial Solutions, LLC (Canter, Ronald)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by FMS Financial Solutions, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Consent) (Canter, Ronald)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Einstein, Joy)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/31/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/30/2020. (jmhs, Chambers)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Appel, Renee)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Appel, Renee)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in the Circuit Court for Montgomery County against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and FMS Financial Solutions, LLC, filed by Florence Michel.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Online Date Exchange LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Einstein, Joy)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number 481022-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8780103), filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit State Court Notice of New Case, #5 Exhibit State Court Scheduling Order, #6 Exhibit Consent to Removal)(Einstein, Joy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michel v. FMS Financial Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Michel
Represented By: Ingmar Bancroft Goldson
Represented By: Joseph Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Renee Beth Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Joy Einstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMS Financial Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Ronald S Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?