Epps, et al v. Whitfield
Plaintiff: Jade Frazier and Jacqueline Epps
Defendant: Anthony Whitfield and Anthony K. Whitfield
Case Number: 8:2020cv02361
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER. In light of the parties' #11 Joint Motion to Stay Case, this case is hereby STAYED until November 23, 2020. The parties are ORDERED to submit a Joint Status Report not later than than November 23, 2020 proposing a schedule for the Defendant's responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/25/2020. (egm, Chambers)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING a telephone conference related to settlement for October 13, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel call-in information has been provided to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/25/2020. (dps, Chambers)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for Mediation. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/24/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Anthony K. Whitfield CERTIFICATION OF FILING OF STATE COURT DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Doc. No. 1, Complaint, #2 Doc. No. 2, Civil - Non Domestic Case Information Report, #3 Doc. No. 3, Writ of Summons, 12.23.19, #4 Doc. No. 4, Request to Reissue Summons, #5 Doc. No. 5, Writ of Summons, 5.23.20, #6 Doc. No. 6, Affidavit of Service, #7 Doc. No. 7, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #8 Doc. No. 8, Civil Case Closure Form)(Zaslow, Levi)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay CASE AND REFER TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Anthony K. Whitfield(Zaslow, Levi)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant's response to the Complaint is due September 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/1/2020. (egm, Chambers)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint by Anthony K. Whitfield(Zaslow, Levi)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Complaint by Anthony K. Whitfield.(Zaslow, Levi)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/19/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/18/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Anthony Whitfield DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTEREST (Zaslow, Levi)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Levi S Zaslow on behalf of Anthony Whitfield (Zaslow, Levi)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL 19-40624. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8808817), filed by Anthony Whitfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Complaint)(Zaslow, Levi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epps, et al v. Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Whitfield
Represented By: Levi S Zaslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony K. Whitfield
Represented By: Levi S Zaslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade Frazier
Represented By: James A DeVita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Epps
Represented By: James A DeVita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?