Kitcher v. Wilmington Trust, National Association
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Trustee: Rebecca A. Herr
Appellant: Dora Kitcher
Case Number: 8:2020cv02367
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Letter to Parties Regarding Briefs (cm 9/30/2020 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Dora Kitcher re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 BK# 1 - Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Dora Kitcher, #2 BK# BK # 2 Certificate of Credit Counseling, #3 BK# BK # 3 Verification of Creditor Matrix, #4 BK# 7 - Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Trustee Rebecca A. Herr with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/23/2020 at 10:00 AM, #5 BK# 8 - Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents and Warning of Possible Dismissal, #6 BK# 9 - Order Directing Debtor(s) Counsel to Comply with Local Bankruptcy Rule 2016-1(b), #7 BK# 10 - Creditor Request for Notices Filed by Synchrony Bank, #8 BK# 11 - Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, #9 BK# 12 - Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, #10 BK# 13 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors, #11 BK# 14 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #12 BK# 15 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document, #13 BK# 16 - Motion to Extend Time Filed by Dora Kitcher, #14 BK# 17 - Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #15 BK# 18 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document, #16 BK# 19 - Motion to Dismiss Case for other reasons with Prejudice Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt 11, #17 BK# 19-1 Proposed Order, #18 BK# 20 - Deficiency Notice Re: Notice related document(s)19 Motion to Dismiss Case, #19 BK# 21 - Notice of Motion.Notice Served on 4/1/2020, Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt 11, #20 BK# 22 - Response on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, #21 BK# 23 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #22 BK# 24 - Schedule A/B: Property for Individual, #23 BK# 25 - Schedule C on behalf of Dora Kitcher, #24 BK# 26 - Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims for Individual, #25 BK# 27 - Schedule G: : Individual - Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, #26 BK# 28 - Schedule H: - Codebtors Individual, #27 BK# 29 - Schedule I: Individual - Your Income on, #28 BK# 30 - Schedule J: Individual - Your Expenses, #29 BK# 31 - Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual, #30 BK# 32 - Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules, #31 BK# 33 - Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period for 5 Years Form 122C-1 Disposable Income Is Determined, #32 BK# 34 - Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Amount of Payments per Month: $100.00, Number of Months:60, #33 BK# 35 - Deficiency Notice (related document(s)34 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, #34 BK# 36 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #35 BK# 37 - Schedule D : Individual - Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property, #36 BK# 38 - Chapter 13 Plan, #37 BK# 39 - Deficiency Notice Re: Declaration (related document(s)37 Schedule D - Creditors Holding Secured Claims, #38 BK# 40 - Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules, #39 BK# 41 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #40 BK# 42 - Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) Meeting Continued to 6/4/2020 at 10:30 AM, #41 BK# 43 - Objection to Claim Number 2 In Re: Wilmington Trust in the Amount of $792990.82, #42 BK# 44 - Deficiency Notice Re: Certificate of Service (related document(s)43 Objection to Claim, #43 BK# 45 - Certificate of Service, #44 BK# 47 - Objection to Claim Number 4 In Re: The Bank of New York Mellon in the Amount of $352945.60, #45 BK# 48 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #46 BK# 49 - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management, #47 BK# 50 - Response on behalf of Dora Kitcher, #48 BK# 51 - Notice of Hearing, #49 BK# 52 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course, #50 BK# 53 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing, #51 BK# 54 - Response on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, #52 BK# 55 - INCORRECT EVENT CODE USED. REDOCKETED AT 56. Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions, #53 BK# 56 - Response on behalf of Dora Kitcher, #54 BK# 57 - Deficiency Notice (related document(s)56 Response, #55 BK# 58 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #56 BK# 59 - Amended Response on behalf of Dora Kitcher, #57 BK# 60 - Personal Financial Management Course Certificate, #58 BK# 61 - Notice of Hearing, #59 BK# 62 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing, #60 BK# 63 - Motion to Continue Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020, #61 BK# 64 - Order Continuing Hearing of Motion to Dismiss. The hearing is continued to September 1, 2020 at 10:00 a.m, #62 BK# 65 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document, #63 BK# 66 - Order Denying Objection Sustaining to Claim #4. DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE OBJECTION WAS NOT SERVED IN THE MANNER REQUIRED BY FED. R. BANKR. P. 7004(h), #64 BK# 67 - INCORRECT EVENT CODE USED. SEE 69. Objection, #65 BK# 68 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document, #66 BK# 69 - Amended Objection to Claim Number 4 In Re: The Bank of New York Mellon in the Amount of $352945.60, #67 BK# 71 - Notice of RESCHEDULED Hearing, #68 BK# 72 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing, #69 BK# 73 - Order Overruling Objection to Claim No. 2, #70 BK# 74 - ZOOM VIDEO Hearing Held, #71 BK# 75 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document, #72 BK# 76 - Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice, #73 BK# 77 - Response on behalf of NewRez LLC, #74 BK# 78 - Order Overruling Debtor's Objection to Claim No. 4, #75 Docket Sheet, #76 Supplemental Transmittal Sheet)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2020: #77 Social Security Number Verification Page, #78 Duplicate Social Security Number Verification Page) (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental Transmittal re #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss for Abuse with Prejudice)(kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/8/2020 (kns, Deputy Clerk).
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Appeal Notification Letter to Pro-se Party. (c/m 8/17/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 20-13149-LSS,, filed by Dora Kitcher. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitcher v. Wilmington Trust, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Rebecca A. Herr
Represented By: Kathryn E Smits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dora Kitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?