Jackson v. Guzman et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda L. Jackson
Defendant: Romeo P. Guzman, CCBCC, Inc. and CCBCC Operations, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02372
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 22 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Thomas, Scott)
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Kopstein, David)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #19 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/15/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for all Proceedings and Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze for Mediation. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/15/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 Case Management Conference held on 10/15/2020 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang (FTR 2B) (dhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 PAPERLESS NOTICE. A RULE 16 CONFERENCE is scheduled for October 15, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 10150930 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties are reminded that they should be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Rule 16 Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (nrs, Chambers)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/16/2021. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/1/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Romeo P. Guzman.(Thomas, Scott)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #12 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Rhonda L. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kopstein, David)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by CCBCC Operations, LLC, CCBCC, Inc..(Thomas, Scott)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by CCBCC Operations, LLC, CCBCC, Inc., Romeo P. Guzman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Bankruptcy)(Thomas, Scott)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant CCBCC, Inc.'s Answer or other responsive pleading is due by September 8, 2020. CCBCC is reminded to follow the protocols of the Case Management Order if it wishes to file a Rule 12 Motion in response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/3/2020. (nrs, Chambers)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Answer to Complaint by CCBCC Operations, LLC, CCBCC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Scott)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/2/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c)(2) provides that in a removed action, a defendant who did not answer before removal has the longer of 21 days after service or 7 days after the notice of removal to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Defendant CCBCC was served on July 30, 2020 and removed this action on August 17, 2020. The deadline for CCBCC to file an answer or other responsive pleading has therefore passed. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/2/2020. (nrs, Chambers)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by CCBCC Operations, LLC, CCBCC, Inc., Romeo P. Guzman Defendants Joint Statement Concerning Removal (Thomas, Scott)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CCBCC Operations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc., Other Affiliate Red Classic Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Swift Water Logistics, Inc., Other Affiliate Data Ventures, Inc. for CCBCC Operations, LLC.(Thomas, Scott)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CCBCC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Coca-Cola Consolidated, Inc., Other Affiliate Red Classic Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Swift Water Logistics, Inc., Other Affiliate Data Ventures, Inc. for CCBCC, Inc..(Thomas, Scott)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by CCBCC, Inc. Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Circuit Court Summons, #4 Exhibit C Circuit Court Civil Info Report, #5 Supplement Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Thomas, Scott)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/17/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CCBCC Operations, LLC, CCBCC, Inc., Romeo P. Guzman, filed by Rhonda L. Jackson.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Prince George's County Circuit Court, case number CAL 20-13581. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8811273), filed by CCBCC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Writ of Summons, #4 Exhibit C Case Information Report, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Thomas, Scott) Modified on 8/17/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Guzman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda L. Jackson
Represented By: David M Kopstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo P. Guzman
Represented By: Scott Anthony Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCBCC, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Anthony Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCBCC Operations, LLC
Represented By: Scott Anthony Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?