Bacci et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Florida Reponte, Manuela Bacci, Elizabeth Reponte Albrecht and Sarah Reponte Sullivan
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 8:2020cv02387
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen S Stallings. Directing attorney Stephen S Stallings to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen S. Stallings (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8844788.) by Manuela Bacci(Tolley, George)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/2/2020. (c/m 9/3/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/3/2020 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Manuela Bacci re #1 Complaint Summonses (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Tolley, George)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #2 Notice (Other) filed by Manuela Bacci was filed with the following attachments missing - proposed summons for both the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland. To correct this problem, file one proposed summons per defendant using the event Notice (Other) and link the proposed summons to #1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Manuela Bacci re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Tolley, George)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8814000.), filed by Manuela Bacci.(Tolley, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacci et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Reponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuela Bacci
Represented By: George Somerville Tolley, III
Represented By: Stephen S Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Reponte Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Reponte Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?