Capital Bank, NA v. Potomac Construction 1525 P Street, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Capital Bank, NA
Defendant: Matthew Shkor and Potomac Construction 1525 P Street, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02402
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
2 Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for Reviewing a Complaint for Judgment by Confession. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/25/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Supplemental to #1 Complaint,, filed by Capital Bank, NA Entry of Judgment by Confession (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Entry of Judgment by Confession)(Anderson, Lawrence)
August 21, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Judge George Jarrod Hazel no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Potomac Construction 1525 P Street, LLC, Matthew Shkor ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8816971.), filed by Capital Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Promissory Note and Modifications, #2 Exhibit B Appointment of Substitute Attorney in Fact, #3 Exhibit C Default letter, #4 Exhibit D Guaranty of Payment, #5 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Complaint, #6 Attachment DOD manpower report, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons for Potomac Construction 1525 P Street, LLC, #9 Summons Summons for Matthew Shkor, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Bank, NA v. Potomac Construction 1525 P Street, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Bank, NA
Represented By: Lawrence John Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Shkor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potomac Construction 1525 P Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?