Potomac Electric Power Company v. Brown
Plaintiff: Potomac Electric Power Company
Defendant: Jeffrey Brown
Case Number: 8:2020cv02405
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 Correspondence from Jeffrey Brown. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Potomac Electric Power Company re #6 Case Management Order -- service of copy of order on Defendant Brown (Neurick, Alan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potomac Electric Power Company. Jeffrey Brown served on 8/23/2020, answer due 9/14/2020.(Neurick, Alan)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/24/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jeffrey Brown.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule Summons for Defendant(Neurick, Alan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Potomac Electric Power Company identifying Corporate Parent Pepco Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Exelon Corporation, Other Affiliate PH Holdco LLC, Other Affiliate Exelon Energy Delivery Company, LLC for Potomac Electric Power Company.(Neurick, Alan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule Civil Cover Sheet(Neurick, Alan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT INCLUDING PETITION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against Jeffrey Brown ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8817249.), filed by Potomac Electric Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MSDAT Report, #2 Exhibit Redacted Release, #3 Exhibit Utility Easement)(Neurick, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potomac Electric Power Company v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Potomac Electric Power Company
Represented By: Alan Burton Neurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?