Garey v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Monica Garey
Defendant: Transworld Systems Inc., Diversified Adjustment Service, Incorporated, Truist Bank, Navy Federal Credit Union, Southwest Credit Systems, L.P., I C System, Inc and Collecto Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02469
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (19-cv-3112-PWG). (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Cases associated: Create association to 8:19-cv-03112-PWG. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER ORDER consolidating PWG-19-3112 and PWG-20-2469 for all purposes; directing Plaintiff to file within 28 days from the issuance of this order a consolidated amended complaint; denying without prejudice as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying without prejudice as moot ECF 33 Motion to Dismiss in PWG-19-3112; denying without prejudice as moot ECF 28 Motion to Dismiss in PWG-19-3112. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/25/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot #26 Motion to Continue Telephone Conference Call. The call was cancelled on 9/23/2020 by Letter Order, ECF No. 24. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/24/2020. (imw, Chambers)
September 24, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Continue 9-25-2020 Telephone Conference Call by Monica Garey(Styles, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W Styles on behalf of Monica Garey (Styles, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER ORDER cancelling telephone conference call scheduled for September 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/23/2020. (c/m as directed 9/23/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Fogleman on behalf of Navy Federal Credit Union (Fogleman, Matthew)
September 17, 2020 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Monica Garey (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document) (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER scheduling a telephone conference for September 25, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/3/2020. (c/m 9/4/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Benjamin Brown on behalf of Truist Bank (Brown, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 Correspondence re: Letter Order (ECF No. 18) (Canter, Ronald)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/3/2020. (c/m 9/3/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 Correspondence re: Def. Truist Intent to File Motion to Dismiss (Moffet, Brian)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Monica Garey (c/m 9/2/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Navy Federal Credit Union (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Canter, Ronald)
August 31, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge George Jarrod Hazel no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew Michael Schwartz. Directing attorney Andrew Michael Schwartz to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Schwartz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8833004.) by Collecto Inc.(Whitelock, Julia)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Navy Federal Credit Union identifying Other Affiliate Navy Federal Finncial Group, LLC for Navy Federal Credit Union.(Canter, Ronald)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald S Canter on behalf of Navy Federal Credit Union (Canter, Ronald)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Collecto Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EOS Holdings (USA), Inc. for Collecto Inc..(Whitelock, Julia)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Collecto Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted*** (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Collecto Inc. (Whitelock, Julia) Modified on 8/27/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Collecto Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Whitelock, Julia)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Removal Notification Letter to Pro Se Party (c/m 8/27/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/27/2020. (c/m 8/27/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 State Court COMPLAINT against Collecto Inc., Diversified Adjustment Service, Incorporated, I C System, Inc, Navy Federal Credit Union, Southwest Credit Systems, L.P., Transworld Systems Inc., Truist Bank, filed by Monica Garey.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Truist Bank Certification of Filing State Court Papers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moffet, Brian)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Bank for Truist Bank.(Moffet, Brian)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Prince George's County, case number CAL20-12433. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8829503), filed by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit)(Moffet, Brian) Modified on 8/27/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garey v. Navy Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Represented By: Brian L Moffet
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Matthew Fogleman
Represented By: Ronald S Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Credit Systems, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I C System, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto Inc.
Represented By: Julia K Whitelock
Represented By: Andrew Michael Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Garey
Represented By: Jeffrey W Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?