Association for Education Fairness v. Montgomery County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Association for Education Fairness
Defendant: Montgomery County Board of Education and Dr. Jack R. Smith
Case Number: 8:2020cv02540
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by Montgomery County Board of Education, Dr. Jack R. Smith (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barley, Steven)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ray Li. Directing attorney Ray Li to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nathaniel Zelinsky. Directing attorney Nathaniel Zelinsky to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jo-Ann Sagar. Directing attorney Jo-Ann Sagar to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ray Li (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8923356.) by Montgomery County Board of Education, Dr. Jack R. Smith(Barley, Steven)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathaniel Zelinsky (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8923343.) by Montgomery County Board of Education, Dr. Jack R. Smith(Barley, Steven)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jo-Ann Sagar (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8923306.) by Montgomery County Board of Education, Dr. Jack R. Smith(Barley, Steven)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time and For Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/25/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time and For Briefing Schedule by Montgomery County Board of Education, Dr. Jack R. Smith (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barley, Steven)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F Barley on behalf of Montgomery County Board of Education, Dr. Jack R. Smith (Barley, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Association for Education Fairness. Montgomery County Board of Education served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020; Dr. Jack R. Smith served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service on Montgomery County Board of Education)(Roper, Glenn)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Association for Education Fairness (Roper, Glenn)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/16/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher M Kieser. Directing attorney Christopher M Kieser to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua P Thompson. Directing attorney Joshua P Thompson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Erin E Wilcox. Directing attorney Erin E Wilcox to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Montgomery County Board of Education, Dr. Jack R. Smith.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher M. Kieser (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8840653.) by Association for Education Fairness(Roper, Glenn)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua P. Thompson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8840580.) by Association for Education Fairness(Roper, Glenn)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Erin E. Wilcox (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8840405.) by Association for Education Fairness(Roper, Glenn)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Montgomery County Board of Education, Dr. Jack R. Smith ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8840114.), filed by Association for Education Fairness. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (2015-17 downcounty data), #3 Exhibit 2 (2016-18 data), #4 Exhibit 3 (2018-20 data), #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Roper, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association for Education Fairness v. Montgomery County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association for Education Fairness
Represented By: Glenn E. Roper
Represented By: Joshua P Thompson
Represented By: Christopher M Kieser
Represented By: Erin E Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Board of Education
Represented By: Steven F Barley
Represented By: Ray Li
Represented By: Nathaniel Zelinsky
Represented By: JoAnn Tamila Sagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jack R. Smith
Represented By: Steven F Barley
Represented By: Ray Li
Represented By: Nathaniel Zelinsky
Represented By: JoAnn Tamila Sagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?