Webb v. Warden et al
Petitioner: Matthew Webb
Respondent: Warden and Walter West
Case Number: 8:2020cv02654
Filed: September 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 Correspondence re: Errata and Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript 4/5/19)(DiMiceli, Andrew)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Respondent's twenty-eight days to file copies of all post-conviction hearing transcripts; Petitioner IS GRANTED 28 days from the date the post-conviction hearing transcripts are filed to submit a Response to the Answer as specified herein. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/3/2020. (c/m jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Warden, Walter West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Record, #2 Exhibit Transcript 9/13/02, #3 Exhibit Transcript 1/6/03, #4 Exhibit Transcript 1/22/03, #5 Exhibit Transcript 4/4/03, #6 Exhibit Transcript 5/5/03, #7 Exhibit Transcript 2/11/04, #8 Exhibit Transcript 2/12/04, #9 Exhibit Transcript 2/13/04, #10 Exhibit Transcript 4/12/04)(DiMiceli, Andrew)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; Petitioner SHALL SUBMIT the $5.00 filing fee within twenty-eight (28) days. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/27/2020. (c/m jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Webb (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER stating Petitioner SHALL SUBMIT the $5.00 filing fee or SHALL FILE a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within twenty-eight (28) days; Respondents SHALL FILE an Answer to the Petition on or before FORTY (40) DAYS from the date of this Order; Petitioner MAY REPLY twenty-eight (28) days after service of Respondents Answer. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/24/2020. (c/m jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Matthew Webb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment)(jj2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Andrew DiMiceli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Walter West
Represented By: Andrew DiMiceli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?