Vaughn-Clark v. The Circuit Court for Prince George's County
Petitioner: Dereck Vaughn-Clark
Respondent: The Circuit Court for Prince George's County and Warden of PGCCC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02720
Filed: September 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Respondent SHALL FILE a response within forty (40) days of the date of this Order;Vaughn-Clark MAY REPLY thirty (30) days after service of Respondents Answer. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 11/4/2020. (c/m jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 Supplemental to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dereck Vaughn-Clark(jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dereck Vaughn-Clark (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Attachment)(jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2020 Filing 3 Exhibit to the Petition by Dereck Vaughn-Clark(jj2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/4/2020 (jj2s, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dereck Vaughn-Clark(jj2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Dereck Vaughn-Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jj2s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #2 Attachment Complaint Part 2) (jj2s, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2020: #3 Exhibit 1) (jj2s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn-Clark v. The Circuit Court for Prince George's County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Circuit Court for Prince George's County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of PGCCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dereck Vaughn-Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?